Global Patent Index - EP 1321011 A1

EP 1321011 A1 2003-06-25 - OTOPLASTIC WITH AN INTEGRATED MODULE, IN-EAR OTOPLASTIC AND METHOD FOR ADAPTING OTOPLASTICS

Title (en)

OTOPLASTIC WITH AN INTEGRATED MODULE, IN-EAR OTOPLASTIC AND METHOD FOR ADAPTING OTOPLASTICS

Title (de)

OTOPLASTIK MIT EINGEBAUTEM MODUL, IM-OHR-OTOPLASTIK UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANPASSUNG VON OTOPLASTIKEN

Title (fr)

OTOPLASTIQUE AVEC MODULE INTEGRE, OTOPLASTIQUE PLACE DANS L'OREILLE ET PROCEDE D'ADAPTATION DES OTOPLASTIQUES

Publication

EP 1321011 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00960277 A

Priority

CH 0000523 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0225994A1] The invention relates to an in-ear hearing aid whose shell (65) is rubber-elastic. This enables the shell to be changed modularly without changing the electronics module on which it is mounted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/10 (2006.01); H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/658 (2013.01); H04R 25/652 (2013.01); H04R 25/654 (2013.01); H04R 2460/11 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0225994A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0225994 A1 20020328; AU 2000272658 B2 20060406; AU 7265800 A 20020402; CA 2419950 A1 20030218; CA 2419950 C 20120717; DE 50014736 D1 20071206; DK 1321011 T3 20080225; EP 1321011 A1 20030625; EP 1321011 B1 20071024; JP 2004508787 A 20040318

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170927

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170927

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170927

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080808

2008-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080725

2008-08-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2008-02-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2007-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014736 P 20071206

2007-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2007-11-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071024

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

2007-10-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-07-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK FR GB IT LI

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040209

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021019

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI