Global Patent Index - EP 1321050 A1

EP 1321050 A1 2003-06-25 - Filter for a smoking article

Title (en)

Filter for a smoking article

Title (de)

Filter für einen rauchbaren Artikel

Title (fr)

Filtre pour un article à fumer

Publication

EP 1321050 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01129382 A

Priority

EP 01129382 A

Abstract (en)

The filter for smokable articles, in particular, cigarettes comprises an inner cover paper (18) with longitudinal grooves (20) which are open at the filter end facing the tobacco, do not extend to the other filter end, and are provided with an outer cover paper (22) provided with ventilating perforations (24). <??>An Independent claim is also included for an application of the filter for reduction of the ratio of carbon monoxide (CO) to condensate dependent on filter ventilation.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Filterkörper (14) für einen rauchbaren Artikel, insbesondere eine Zigarette, mit einem zylindrischen Filterkörper (16), mit einem Umhüllungspapier (18) für den Filterkörper, mit in das Umhüllungspapier eingeprägten Rillen (20) und mit einem Belagpapier (22) für die Befestigung des Filterkörpers an dem Tabakstrang, wobei alle Rillen zur Seite des Tabakstrangs hin offen sind und sich kontinuierlich nur über einen Teil der Länge des Filterkörpers erstrecken. Alle Rillen sind durch ein ventiliertes Belagpapier abgedeckt. Außerdem betrifft die Erfindung die Verwendung eines solchen Filters für die Reduktion des Verhältnisses CO/Kondensat in Abhängigkeit von der Filterventilation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24D 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24D 1/04 (2006.01); A24D 3/02 (2006.01); A24D 3/04 (2006.01); A24D 3/10 (2006.01); A24D 3/16 (2006.01); D21H 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24D 3/043 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321050 A1 20030625; EP 1321050 B1 20061004; AP 1915 A 20081110; AP 200403057 A0 20040630; AR 037903 A1 20041222; AT 341234 T 20061015; AU 2002350932 A1 20030630; AU 2002350932 B2 20060413; AU 2002350932 C1 20061214; BR 0215033 A 20041103; BR 0215033 B1 20120124; CA 2470198 A1 20030626; CA 2470198 C 20080909; CN 100379364 C 20080409; CN 1604744 A 20050406; CO 5590868 A2 20051230; DE 50111161 D1 20061116; DK 1321050 T3 20070212; EA 007110 B1 20060630; EA 200400786 A1 20041230; EG 23225 A 20040831; EP 1458253 A1 20040922; ES 2269284 T3 20070401; GE P20063756 B 20060227; HK 1076686 A1 20090206; HR P20040509 A2 20041031; HU 0402618 A2 20050530; HU 0402618 A3 20121029; IL 162446 D0 20051120; JP 2005511107 A 20050428; JP 4015999 B2 20071128; KR 100737573 B1 20070710; KR 20040061044 A 20040706; MX PA04006078 A 20040927; OA 12741 A 20060630; PL 197771 B1 20080430; PL 370700 A1 20050530; RS 50890 B 20100831; TW 200410643 A 20040701; TW I323646 B 20100421; UA 76567 C2 20041015; US 2005076927 A1 20050414; US 2010319718 A1 20101223; WO 03051144 A1 20030626; YU 50904 A 20060817; ZA 200404588 B 20051130

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170701

2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161218

2017-11-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161218

2017-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50111161

2017-06-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151218

2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151219

2017-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2017-01-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170126

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151218

2016-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151218

2016-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160707

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-03 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20060403926

- Effective date: 20160707

2016-09-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160831

2016-09-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151219

2016-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 341234 T

- Effective date: 20151218

2016-08-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-07-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-07-18 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151211

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141223

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-01-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-01-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20141211

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-01-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20141215

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-01-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061004

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061218

2007-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070705

2007-06-27 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2007-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2269284 T3

2007-03-16 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070316

2007-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-02-12 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2007-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070115

2007-01-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-18 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20060403926

2006-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50111161 P 20061116

2006-11-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2006-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: RO SI

2006-10-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-10-04 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061004

2005-03-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050208

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030814

- Countries: RO

2004-03-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030814

- Countries: SI

2003-10-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI