Global Patent Index - EP 1321054 A2

EP 1321054 A2 2003-06-25 - Hockey helmet having an inflatable bladder

Title (en)

Hockey helmet having an inflatable bladder

Title (de)

Hockeyhelm mit aufblasbarem Luftkissen

Title (fr)

Casque de hockey muni d'une poche gonflable

Publication

EP 1321054 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02293186 A

Priority

CA 2365894 A

Abstract (en)

A hockey helmet (10) for receiving a head of a wearer, the head having a crown region (CR), left and right temple regions (LT,RT), left and right side regions (LS,RS) and an occipital region (OC). The hockey helmet (10) comprises a front portion (18) facing the crown region (CR) and the left and right temple regions (LT,RT) of the head and a rear portion (20) facing the left and right side regions (LS,RS)and the occipital region (OC) of the head. The hockey helmet (10) also comprises an inflatable bladder (50) mounted on the rear portion and adjacent to the occipital region (OC) of the head. The inflatable bladder (50) is capable of applying pressure on the occipital region (OC) of the head for urging the front portion (18) of the hockey helmet (10) towards the crown region (CR) of the head when the helmet (10) is placed on the head. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A42B 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/122 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH CZ DE FI LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321054 A2 20030625; EP 1321054 A3 20040526; CA 2365894 A1 20030621; US 2003135914 A1 20030724

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-09-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH CZ DE FI LI SE

2005-02-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH CZ DE FI LI SE

2004-11-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040910

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO