Global Patent Index - EP 1321059 A1

EP 1321059 A1 2003-06-25 - Protection element for footwear such as a ski boot, snowboarding boot, trekking boot or suchlike

Title (en)

Protection element for footwear such as a ski boot, snowboarding boot, trekking boot or suchlike

Title (de)

Schutzelement für Schuhwerk, insbesondere Skistiefel, Snowboardstiefel, Trekkingstiefel, oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Elément de protection pour article chaussant, en particulier pour chaussure de ski, de surf, de randonnée, ou similaire

Publication

EP 1321059 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02027946 A

Priority

IT UD20010213 A

Abstract (en)

Protection element (10) for footwear such as a ski boot, snowboarding boot, trekking boot or suchlike, having an upper (12) equipped with a front aperture (13) lying substantially on a median longitudinal axis ("X"). The protection element (10) comprises a shaped tongue (17) arranged above the front aperture (13) and having a first end attached to the upper (12) by means of first attachment means (18). Elastic means (20) are superimposed above the tongue (17) and are attached to the upper (12) by means of the first attachment means (18) and by means of second attachment means (26) arranged in two attachment zones substantially equidistant from the median longitudinal axis ("X"), in order to keep the tongue (17) aligned with the median longitudinal axis ("X"). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 23/26; A43B 5/04; A43B 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01); A43B 7/12 (2006.01); A43B 23/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/0415 (2013.01); A43B 7/12 (2013.01); A43B 23/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321059 A1 20030625; IT UD20010213 A1 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060124

2004-04-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031224

2004-03-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO