Global Patent Index - EP 1321063 A2

EP 1321063 A2 2003-06-25 - Wax pattern, process for setting precious and non-precious stones and jewel obtained

Title (en)

Wax pattern, process for setting precious and non-precious stones and jewel obtained

Title (de)

Wachsmodelle, Verfahren zum Fassen von Edel- und nicht Edelsteinen und Schmuckstück

Title (fr)

Modèle de cire, procédé pour sertir les pierres précieuses et non précieuses, bijou ainsi obtenu

Publication

EP 1321063 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02028384 A

Priority

IT PD20010293 A

Abstract (en)

The invention is a new wax pattern for the production of jewels set with stones, provided with protrusions to create the stone seats, wherein said protrusions have inclined side walls and the top side shorter than the base. According to the process adopted to set stones on wax patterns with protrusions, each stone is pressed into its seat and deforms the inclined walls of said protrusions, creating recesses that have exactly the same size as the edge of the stone itself. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 17/04 (2006.01); A44C 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 17/04 (2013.01); A44C 27/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321063 A2 20030625; EP 1321063 A3 20040623; IT PD20010293 A1 20030620

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041224

2005-04-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-03-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO