Global Patent Index - EP 1321064 A1

EP 1321064 A1 2003-06-25 - Collapsible storage box

Title (en)

Collapsible storage box

Title (de)

Zusammenfaltbarer Lagerbehälter

Title (fr)

Boîte de rangement pliable

Publication

EP 1321064 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01130686 A

Priority

EP 01130686 A

Abstract (en)

A combination storage box is constructed to include a collapsible box body (1), a hard bottom plate (3) fitted into the box body, a folding collapsible support frame (2) inserted into the box body to support the box body in shape, and hook and loop materials (13,14) fixedly provided in the box body and adapted for securing the folding collapsible support frame to the inside of the box body in the working position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45C 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 43/02 (2006.01); B65D 37/00 (2006.01); A45C 7/00 (2006.01); A45C 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 43/02 (2013.01); B65D 37/00 (2013.01); A45C 7/0036 (2013.01); A45C 13/04 (2013.01); B65D 2313/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321064 A1 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-05 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041112

2004-12-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2004-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI