Global Patent Index - EP 1321068 A1

EP 1321068 A1 2003-06-25 - Item of furniture

Title (en)

Item of furniture

Title (de)

Möbelstück

Title (fr)

Meuble

Publication

EP 1321068 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02258679 A

Priority

GB 0130389 A

Abstract (en)

An item of furniture integrally moulded from plastics material has two parallel vertical sidewalls (1) defining two sides of a substantially rectangular front aperture (4), flanges (7) extending outwardly from the free edges of said sidewalls (1) for attaching the item to vertical studs (11), and an upper wall (5) joining said parallel sidewalls. The upper wall (5) lies at an angle of between 35 DEG and 55 DEG to the plane of the aperture (4) to facilitate fitting of the item of furniture into a loft conversion. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 81/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 81/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 81/002 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 8403822 A1 19841011 - RASMUSSEN HOLDING AS V KANN [DK]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

GB 0130389 D0 20020206; GB 2370219 A 20020626; GB 2370219 B 20021120; EP 1321068 A1 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040622

2004-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040316

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-04-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO