Global Patent Index - EP 1321072 A1

EP 1321072 A1 2003-06-25 - Component to construct a rack, furniture, a column or similar

Title (en)

Component to construct a rack, furniture, a column or similar

Title (de)

Element zum Aufbau eines Gestells, eines Möbels, einer Säule oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Elément pour construire un casier, un meuble, une colonne ou similaire

Publication

EP 1321072 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02027890 A

Priority

DE 20120498 U

Abstract (en)

The frame profile for furniture has a rectangular or square section with an H-section profiling. the H-section profile can have opposing cut outs (11,12) to form the H-shape. The cut outs form flanks (13,14) and base surfaces (15). The H-section has further grooves (18-21) to connect to other sections.

Abstract (de)

Ein Element zum Aufbau eines Gestells, eines Möbels, einer Säule oder dergleichen besteht aus einem vieleckförmigen Körper 10 beliebiger Länge mit einem im Querschnitt h-förmigen Profil, wobei das h-förmige Profil von einer ersten Aussparung 11 und einer dazu gegenüberliegenden zweiten Aussparung 12 gebildet ist, die jeweils Nutflanken 13, 14 und einen Nutgrund 15 aufweisen. Die Aussparungen 11, 12 und/oder die Außenseitenflächen 16, 17 des Körpers 10 sind als Aufnahmen 18, 19, 20, 21 für eine Verbindung mit weiteren Elementen vorgesehen. Das erfindungsgemäße Element kann zum Aufbau von Bürolandschaften, Wandsystemen, Verblendungen jedweder Art eingesetzt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 96/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/1466 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20120498 U1 20020314; EP 1321072 A1 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031018

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO