Global Patent Index - EP 1321074 A2

EP 1321074 A2 2003-06-25 - Locking device

Title (en)

Locking device

Title (de)

Rastbeschlag

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage

Publication

EP 1321074 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02023252 A

Priority

DE 20120428 U

Abstract (en)

A furniture hinge fitting links the base of e.g. a chair or divan with a rake-adjustable back. The hinge has a ratchet which holds the back under load. The hinge has especially a double ratchet engaging in two sets of teeth.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Rastbeschlag (10) zum Verschwenken beispielsweise einer Rückenlehne eines Schlafsofas. Die Erfindung schlägt vor, den Rastbeschlag (10) nach Art einer Ratsche in einer Richtung schwenkbar auszubilden und mit mehreren, beispielsweise drei Rasten (36) zu versehen, die mit ebenso vielen Rastzähnen (16) in Eingriff stehen. Auf diese Weise ist eine Belastbarkeit des Rastbeschlags (10) erhöht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 20/04; A47C 17/16; B60N 2/235; F16D 63/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 17/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 17/162 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20120428 U1 20020404; EP 1321074 A2 20030625; EP 1321074 A3 20040121

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040722

2004-11-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47C 20/04 A

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47C 17/16 B

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 16D 63/00 B

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60N 2/235 B

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI