Global Patent Index - EP 1321075 A2

EP 1321075 A2 2003-06-25 - Waterbed

Title (en)

Waterbed

Title (de)

Wasserbett

Title (fr)

Lit à eau

Publication

EP 1321075 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02027358 A

Priority

DE 10162775 A

Abstract (en)

The mattress (1) has a deep-drawn, hood-like head-piece (7) and foot-part (8) between which is a tubular sheath (9) formed from a rectangular section whose two lengthwise edges (10) are welded together. The open edges (11) of the head and foot-parts all round are welded to the open edges of the sheath. The head, foot and sheath are made from one sheet.

Abstract (de)

Es handelt sich um ein Wasserbett mit einer Matratze, die in einen Tragrahmen mit einer denselben auskleidenden Sicherheitsfolie einsetzbar ist. Um ein Wasserbett zu schaffen, das in den stark belasteten Eckbereichen der Matratze und/oder der Sicherheitshülle wesentlich verbessert ist und somit das erfindungsgemäße Wasserbett auslaufsicherer als bei herkömmlich Wasserbetten ausgebildet ist, besteht die Matratze (1) aus einem tiefgezogenen, haubenförmig ausgebildeten Kopfteil (7), einem ebenfalls tiefgezogenen, haubenförmig ausgebildeten Fußteil (8) sowie einer zwischen dem Kopfteil (7) und dem Fußteil (8) eingesetzten, aus einem rechteckigen Zuschnitt gebildeten schlauchartigen Hülle (9), deren beide Längsränder (10) miteinander verschweißt sind. Die umlaufenden offenen Ränder (11) des Kopfteils (7) und des Fußteil (8) sind mit den umlaufenden offenen Rändern (12) der Hülle (9) verschweißt. Die Sicherheitshülle ist ebenfalls aus einem tiefgezogenen, haubenförmig ausgebildeten Kopfteil, einem ebenfalls tiefgezogenen, haubenförmig ausgebildeten Fußteil sowie einer zwischen dem Kopfteil und dem Fußteil eingesetzten, im Querschnitt C-förmig ausgebildeten Zwischenteil gebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 27/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/085 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 20105371 U1 20010705 - WOHNFORM GMBH & CO WERKSTAETTE [DE], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321075 A2 20030625; EP 1321075 A3 20040114; DE 10162775 A1 20030710; DE 10162775 B4 20041118

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-11 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060823

2004-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040628

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO