Global Patent Index - EP 1321090 A2

EP 1321090 A2 2003-06-25 - Electric household appliance, in particular a dishwashing machine, with an improved access door

Title (en)

Electric household appliance, in particular a dishwashing machine, with an improved access door

Title (de)

Elektrisches Haushaltsgerät, insbesondere eine Geschirrspülmaschine, mit einer verbesserten Tür

Title (fr)

Appareil électroménager, en particulier un lave-vaisselle, avec une porte ameliorée

Publication

EP 1321090 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02024012 A

Priority

IT PN20010089 A

Abstract (en)

The electric home appliance comprises an outer casing (1) with an access door (4), as well as a setting and/or control arrangement formed by an electric portion (6; 18; 22; 25) and a user-interface portion (7; 8; 21; 26) accessible in correspondence of said door. The user-interface portion is mounted on the door (4), whereas the electric portion is mounted on the casing (1) so as to be only able to functionally couple with the user-interface portion when the access door is closed <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4259 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321090 A2 20030625; EP 1321090 A3 20041222; IT PN20010089 A1 20030619

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-10-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-09-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI