Global Patent Index - EP 1321091 A1

EP 1321091 A1 2003-06-25 - Safety element for pivotable elements of the carrier member of a household appliance

Title (en)

Safety element for pivotable elements of the carrier member of a household appliance

Title (de)

Sicherungselement für verschwenkbare Betätigungselemente am Blendenträger eines Haushaltsgerätes

Title (fr)

Elément de securité pour des elements pivotants de l'écran d'un appareil électroménager

Publication

EP 1321091 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02024721 A

Priority

DE 20120806 U

Abstract (en)

The release mechanism (2) at the top of a dish washing machine door hinges on a pin (4) in bearings (5) and projections (3) are locked by springs (6) which may form part of the rear side (10) of the cover moulding (1).

Abstract (de)

Am Blendenträger (1) eines Haushaltgerätes, z.B. einer Geschirrspülmaschine sind verschiedene Betätigungselemente z.B. ein Griffschalendeckel (2), verschwenkbar angeordnet. Die Verschwenkung der Betätigungselemente erfolgt duch manuellen Eingriff in bzw. auf diese. Um die Verschwenkung eines Betätigungselementes, z.B. eines Griffschalendeckels (2), zu ermöglichen sind Scharniere vorgesehen, z.B. gebildet aus einem in Lagerelemente (5) eingreifende Bolzen (4). Die Verschwenkelemente sind durch ein Federelement (6,6a) gegeneinander wiederlösbar gesichert und damit am Blendenträger so angeordnet, dass im Servicefall jedes Betätigungselement einzeln und wiederholt am Blendenträger (1) ausgetauscht werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4293 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 20120806 U1 20030508; DE 50206797 D1 20060622; EP 1321091 A1 20030625; EP 1321091 B1 20060517

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121106

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-08-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-07-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121106

2012-02-17 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20120116

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111130

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101213

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070220

2006-12-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-09-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060814

2006-06-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50206797 P 20060622

2006-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-05-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060517

2005-08-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050630

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI