Global Patent Index - EP 1321092 A2

EP 1321092 A2 2003-06-25 - Dishwasher

Title (en)

Dishwasher

Title (de)

Geschirrspülmaschine

Title (fr)

Lave-vaisselle

Publication

EP 1321092 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02024722 A

Priority

DE 10160895 A

Abstract (en)

A handle recess (9) has a handle recess lower part (10) and a handle recess cover (11), which swivels on a panel support and/or the handle recess lower part so that a hand inserted into the handle recess cover swivels the handle recess cover from an inactive position into a swiveling position and activates the unlocking mechanism in a door to open the door.

Abstract (de)

Blendenträger einer Geschirrspülmaschine mit einer Griffschale (9), die ein Griffschalenunterteil (10) und einen Griffschalendeckel (11) umfasst, wobei der Griffschalendekkel (11) verschwenkbar am Blendenträger und/oder Griffschalenunterteil (10) so angeordnet ist, dass durch manuellen Eingriff in den Griffschalendeckel (11) der Griffschalendeckel (11) aus einer Ruhestellung in eine Verschwenkstellung verschwenkt wird und dabei der Entriegelungsmechanismus des Türschlosses betätigt wird, welcher das Türschloss öffnet. Ferner ist am Griffschalendeckel (11) zumindest ein mit diesem einstückig ausgebildetes Federelement (15) vorgesehen, welches den Griffschalendeckel aus seiner Verschwenkstellung in seine Ruhestellung zurückstellt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4257 (2013.01); A47L 15/4293 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321092 A2 20030625; EP 1321092 A3 20061025; EP 1321092 B1 20080507; DE 10160895 A1 20030703; DE 50212218 D1 20080619; ES 2302779 T3 20080801

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121107

2014-03-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140306

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121106

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-08-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-07-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121106

2012-02-17 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20120116

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111125

- Year of fee payment: 10

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111130

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101213

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-04-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090210

2008-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2302779 T3

2008-06-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50212218 P 20080619

2008-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2008-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20061018

2006-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2006-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI