Global Patent Index - EP 1321126 A1

EP 1321126 A1 2003-06-25 - Cosmetic compositions comprising polymers having complementary chemical functions

Title (en)

Cosmetic compositions comprising polymers having complementary chemical functions

Title (de)

Kosmetische Zusammensetzungen enthaltend Polymere mit sich ergänzenden chemischen Funktionen

Title (fr)

Compositions cosmétiques comprenant des polymères à fonctions chimiques complémentaires

Publication

EP 1321126 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02292958 A

Priority

FR 0116387 A

Abstract (en)

Cosmetic composition comprises two polymers that have complementary (not defined) non-photoactivatable functional groups and do not react with each other to form covalent bonds before application of the composition to keratinic materials but are capable of reacting with each other after application. <??>Cosmetic composition comprises two polymers that have complementary (not defined) non-photoactivatable functional groups and do not react with each other to form covalent bonds before application of the composition to keratinic materials but are capable of reacting with each other to form covalent bonds after application of the composition to keratinic materials. One polymer has functional groups selected from epoxy, aziridine, vinyl, activated vinyl, anhydride, acid chloride, carboxylate ester, aldehyde, (hemi)acetal, (hemi)aminal, ketone, alpha -halo ketone, alpha -hydroxy ketone, lactone, thiolactone, isocyanate, thiocyanate, N-hydroxysuccinimide ester, imide, imine, imidate, thiosulfate, oxazoline, oxazolinium, oxazine, oxazinium, 1-30C alkyl iodide, bromide or chloride, 6-30C aryl or aralkyl iodide, bromide or chloride, unsaturated carbocyclic or heterocyclic halide and 1-30C alkylsulfonyl chloride or fluoride. The other polymer has functional groups of formula (I): <??>XHn (I) <??>X = O, N, S or COO <??>n = 1 or 2 <??>An Independent claim is also included for a hair cosmetic method comprising application of a composition as above.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention a pour objet des compositions cosmétiques, comprenant au moins deux polymères comprenant des fonctions chimiques complémentaires, aptes à former un gainage sur les matières kératiniques et en particulier sur les cheveux. Elle vise également un procédé cosmétique comprenant la mise en oeuvre de ces polymères sur les matières kératiniques, et en particulier sur les cheveux ainsi que leur utilisation pour réaliser un gainage sur les cheveux.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61Q 5/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/34 (2006.01); A61K 8/35 (2006.01); A61K 8/37 (2006.01); A61K 8/42 (2006.01); A61K 8/64 (2006.01); A61K 8/72 (2006.01); A61K 8/73 (2006.01); A61K 8/81 (2006.01); A61K 8/84 (2006.01); A61K 8/88 (2006.01); A61K 8/89 (2006.01); A61K 8/891 (2006.01); A61K 8/893 (2006.01); A61K 8/896 (2006.01); A61K 8/92 (2006.01); A61Q 5/04 (2006.01); A61Q 5/06 (2006.01); A61Q 5/10 (2006.01); C08L 83/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/42 (2013.01); A61K 8/73 (2013.01); A61K 8/731 (2013.01); A61K 8/736 (2013.01); A61K 8/8135 (2013.01); A61K 8/8141 (2013.01); A61K 8/8164 (2013.01); A61K 8/84 (2013.01); A61K 8/88 (2013.01); A61K 8/893 (2013.01); A61Q 5/00 (2013.01); A61Q 5/06 (2013.01); A61K 2800/54 (2013.01); A61K 2800/88 (2013.01); A61K 2800/884 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321126 A1 20030625; BR 0207147 A 20030930; CN 1196462 C 20050413; CN 1426772 A 20030702; FR 2833487 A1 20030620; FR 2833487 B1 20040827; JP 2003192542 A 20030709; JP 2006036794 A 20060209; US 2003143175 A1 20030731; US 2008014161 A1 20080117; US 2008226578 A1 20080918

INPADOC legal status


2009-12-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090714

2009-03-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61Q 5/00 20060101AFI20090202BHEP

2009-03-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/72 20060101ALI20090202BHEP

2007-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050816

2006-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050816

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031229

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI