Global Patent Index - EP 1321154 A2

EP 1321154 A2 2003-06-25 - Bioabsorbable coatings of surgical devices

Title (en)

Bioabsorbable coatings of surgical devices

Title (de)

Bioabsorbierbare Beschichtungen für chirurgische Artikel

Title (fr)

Revêtements bioabsorbables pour articles chirurgicaux

Publication

EP 1321154 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02258785 A

Priority

US 2789101 A

Abstract (en)

Bioabsorbable coatings for bioabsorbable implantable medical devices having dragging or engagement surfaces. The coatings on a surface of the devices reduce device drag. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61L 31/16; A61L 31/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61L 27/38 (2006.01); A61L 27/48 (2006.01); A61L 27/52 (2006.01); A61L 27/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61L 31/10 (2013.01); A61B 17/80 (2013.01); A61B 17/866 (2013.01); A61F 2/0811 (2013.01); A61L 27/34 (2013.01); A61L 27/38 (2013.01); A61L 27/48 (2013.01); A61L 27/52 (2013.01); A61L 27/56 (2013.01); A61L 27/58 (2013.01); A61L 31/14 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00004 (2013.01); A61F 2002/0858 (2013.01); A61F 2210/0004 (2013.01); A61L 2400/10 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61L 27/48 + C08L 5/04
  2. A61L 27/48 + C08L 89/06
  3. A61L 27/34 + C08L 67/04

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321154 A2 20030625; EP 1321154 A3 20040107; EP 1321154 B1 20120725; US 2003120280 A1 20030626; US 2010185199 A1 20100722; US 2012226280 A1 20120906; US 2015005770 A1 20150101; US 7713272 B2 20100511; US 8197480 B2 20120612; US 8840613 B2 20140923; US 9737643 B2 20170822

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20171219

2018-07-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60243365

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161111

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161214

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-11-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-22 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60243365

- Effective date: 20130426

2013-07-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130426

2012-09-20 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60243365

- Effective date: 20120920

2012-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2012-07-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2012-07-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEPUY MITEK, INC.

2004-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040929

2004-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040621

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61L 31/16 A

2004-01-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61L 31/10 B

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO