Global Patent Index - EP 1321173 A1

EP 1321173 A1 2003-06-25 - Ski binding

Title (en)

Ski binding

Title (de)

Skibindung

Title (fr)

Fixation pour ski

Publication

EP 1321173 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01811264 A

Priority

EP 01811264 A

Abstract (en)

The ski-boot holder (10) has a front jaw (50) holding the toes, and a heel-jaw (80). The ski-boot holder swivels on a first swivel axis (1) across the ski's lengthwise direction and parallel with the top side of the ski (90). The ski boot holder is attached to a base part (3) fixed to the ski. The ski boot holder has a front (20) and back (40) part

Abstract (de)

Eine Skibindung weist einen Skischuhträger (10) auf, an welchem ein zum Halten eines Skischuhs im Bereich der Skischuhspitze ausgebildeter Vorderbacken (50) und ein zum Halten des Skischuhs im Bereich der Skischuhferse ausgebildeter Fersenbacken (80) angebracht sind, wobei durch den Vorderbacken (50) und den Fersenbacken (80) eine Längsrichtung des Skischuhträgers definiert wird. Der Skischuhträger (10) ist bezüglich dem Ski um eine erste quer zur Skilängsrichtung und parallel zur Skioberseite verlaufende Schwenkachse (1) herum schwenkbar. Die erste Schwenkachse (1) ist in Skischuhträgerlängsrichtung betrachtet in einer von der für die Skischuhspitze vorgesehenen Längslage in Richtung zum Fersenbacken (80) hin zurückversetzten Längslage angeordnet, in einem für den Vorderfuss vorgesehenen Längsbereich. Der Skischuhträger (10) um die erste Schwenkachse (1) herum schwenkbar derart an einem skifesten Basisteil (3) angelenkt, dass die Position der ersten Schwenkachse (1) bezüglich dem Ski fixiert ist. Die efindungsgemässe Skibindung ermöglicht einen ergonomischen Bewegungsablauf beim Aufsteigen und weist dennoch eine vergleichsweise einfache Konstruktion auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/20; A63C 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/08 (2012.01); A63C 9/20 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/0807 (2013.01); A63C 9/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321173 A1 20030625; EP 1321173 B1 20041215; AT 284742 T 20050115; DE 50104848 D1 20050120

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161116

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151221

2016-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151221

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 284742 T

- Effective date: 20151221

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50104848

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150831

2015-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: EIGERSTRASSE 2 POSTFACH, 3000 BERN 14 (CH)

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141128

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131128

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071221

2008-06-18 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20080214

2007-01-31 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SALEWA SPORTGERAETE GMBH

- Effective date: 20050826

2005-11-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SALEWA SPORTGERAETE GMBH

- Effective date: 20050826

2005-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50104848 P 20050120

2005-01-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2004-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2003-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030825

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI