Global Patent Index - EP 1321178 A2

EP 1321178 A2 2003-06-25 - A braid-reinforced hollow fiber membrane

Title (en)

A braid-reinforced hollow fiber membrane

Title (de)

Durch Geflecht verstärkte Hohlfasermembran

Title (fr)

Membrane en forme de fibre creuse renforcée par cordon

Publication

EP 1321178 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02026922 A

Priority

KR 20010077181 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a braid-reinforced hollow fiber membrane. The hollow fiber membrane comprises a reinforcing material of a tubular braid and a polymer resinous thin film coated on the surface of the reinforcing material. The polymer resinous thin film has a skin layer with micro pores having a diameter in the range from 0.01 to 1 mu m and an inner layer of a sponge structure with micro pores having a diameter less than 10 mu m. Since the hollow fiber membrane of the present invention is coated with a polymer resinous thin film having a skin layer of a dense structure and an inner layer of a sponge structure with micro pores smaller than 10 mu m on the reinforcing material of tubular braid, the mechanical strength and the filtration reliability are excellent and simultaneously the water permeability is good.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 69/08; B01D 67/00; B01D 69/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 67/00 (2006.01); B01D 69/08 (2006.01); B01D 69/10 (2006.01); B01D 69/12 (2006.01); B01D 71/34 (2006.01); B01D 71/42 (2006.01); B01D 71/64 (2006.01); B01D 71/68 (2006.01); D01F 6/76 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01D 69/10 (2013.01); B01D 67/0011 (2013.01); B01D 69/02 (2013.01); B01D 69/08 (2013.01); B01D 2325/02 (2013.01); B01D 2325/04 (2013.01); B01D 2325/36 (2013.01); Y10T 428/13 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1317 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1321 (2013.01); Y10T 428/249953 (2015.04); Y10T 428/2935 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2938 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2975 (2013.01); Y10T 428/298 (2013.01); Y10T 442/20 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321178 A2 20030625; EP 1321178 A3 20050105; EP 1321178 B1 20110330; AU 2002354260 A1 20030617; DE 60239585 D1 20110512; ES 2364268 T3 20110830; JP 2003225542 A 20030812; JP 4050977 B2 20080220; KR 100493113 B1 20050531; KR 20030047715 A 20030618; US 2003134550 A1 20030717; US 2007116871 A1 20070524; US 7267872 B2 20070911; US 7413804 B2 20080819; WO 03047734 A1 20030612

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180116

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-09-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-09-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-04-26 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60239585

- Effective date: 20120102

2012-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120102

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110330

2011-08-30 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2364268 T3

- Effective date: 20110830

2011-07-20 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20110330

2011-05-12 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60239585

- Effective date: 20110512

2011-05-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60239585 P 20110512

2011-03-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR NL

2011-03-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEE, MOO-SEOK

2011-03-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHOI, SUNG-HAK,203 WOOSUNG HEIGHTS VILLA, 251-5

2011-03-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHIN, YONG-CHEOL2C/O KOLON R & D CENTER

2007-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070709

2005-09-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR NL

2005-04-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050223

2005-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2005-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2004-01-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEE, MOO-SEOK

2004-01-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHOI, SUNG-HAK,203 WOOSUNG HEIGHTS VILLA, 251-5

2004-01-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHIN, YONG-CHEOL2C/O KOLON R & D CENTER

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO