Global Patent Index - EP 1321193 A2

EP 1321193 A2 2003-06-25 - Cleaning device and method for glue nozzles

Title (en)

Cleaning device and method for glue nozzles

Title (de)

Reinigungseinrichtung und Reinigungsverfahren für Leimauftragdüsen

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de nettoyage pour buses à colle

Publication

EP 1321193 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02025430 A

Priority

DE 10163744 A

Abstract (en)

The cleaning device is fitted to a packet-making machine with at least one glue application jet (1). There is also a suction device (7, 8, 17), by means of which excess cleaning fluid (16) is sucked away after the glue application jet has been charged with it. The liquid glue (13, 14) and the dissolved impurities are sucked away from a region (20) in the vicinity of the jet.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Reinigungseinrichtung für eine Leimauftragdüse (1), die zum Auftrag von Leim (32) auf Materialien (33) der tabakverarbeitenden Industrie bzw. auf Verpackungsmaterialien vorgesehen ist, wobei eine Vorrichtung (2, 18) zum Beaufschlagen wenigstens einer Leimauftragdüse (1) mit einer Flüssigkeit (3, 14) vorgesehen ist, die wenigstens eine Flüssigkeitsaustrittsöffnung (2) umfaßt. Die Erfindung betrifft ferner ein Verfahren zum Reinigen einer Leimauftragdüse (1) einer Maschine der tabakverarbeitenden Industrie bzw. einer Verpackungsmaschine, wobei die Leimauftragdüse (1) mit einem Flüssigkeitsstrahl (14) beaufschlagt wird, mittels dem Verunreinigungen von der Leimauftragdüse (1) abgelöst werden. Die erfindungsgemäße Reinigungseinrichtung zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß die eine Saugvorrichtung (7, 8, 17, 24, 30) vorgesehen ist, mittels der die Flüssigkeit (16) nach dem Beaufschlage der Leimauftragdüse (1) abgesaugt wird. Das erfindungsgemäße Verfahren zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß die Flüssigkeit (3, 14) und die abgelösten Verunreinigungen aus einem Bereich (20) in der Nähe der Leimauftragdüse (1) abgesaugt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/24 (2006.01); B05B 15/02 (2006.01); B05C 11/10 (2006.01); B05D 3/10 (2006.01); B05C 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/555 (2018.02); B05C 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321193 A2 20030625; EP 1321193 A3 20050119; CN 1445027 A 20031001; DE 10163744 A1 20030703; JP 2003211074 A 20030729; PL 357804 A1 20030630; US 2003127530 A1 20030710

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2006-01-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-10-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2005-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI