Global Patent Index - EP 1321197 A2

EP 1321197 A2 2003-06-25 - Process and apparatus for coating moving substrates

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for coating moving substrates

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Beschichtung von bewegten Substraten

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour revêtir des substrats en mouvement

Publication

EP 1321197 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02027916 A

Priority

DE 10163025 A

Abstract (en)

A fluidizing container (1) has a feed (2) for fluidizing air ionized with single polarity. This fluidizing air fluidizes an electrically non-conductive powder paint fed in via a powder feeder (4) and charged with single polarity. A roller (5) dips in a depositing area (8) and attaches to an electrically conductive fixed earthed metal core (11). <??>An Independent claim is also included for a device for covering substrates with a powder coating.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Beschichtung von Substraten mit einer Pulverschicht, indem Pulver elektrostatisch auf die Oberfläche einer Transfervorrichtung abgeschieden, die Transfervorrichtung und das Substrat relativ zueinander in einem Übertragungsbereich in gleicher oder entgegengesetzter Richtung oder quer zueinander geführt werden, wobei in dem Übertragungsbereich die mit der Pulverschicht beschichtete Oberfläche der Transfervorrichtung und die zu beschichtende Oberfläche des Substrates einen Spalt bildend einander gegenüber angeordnet sind, und das Pulver im Übertragungsbereich von der Transfervorrichtung auf das Substrat übertragen wird. Im Übertragungsbereich wird durch mindestens eine bezüglich des Spaltes hinter der Transfervorrichtung und/oder hinter dem Substrat angeordnete Elektrode ein die Pulverpartikel zu dem Substrat bewegendes elektrisches Feld erzeugt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 1/28; B01D 1/06; B05C 1/08; B05C 1/14; B05C 19/00; B05D 1/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 1/08 (2006.01); B05C 1/14 (2006.01); B05C 19/00 (2006.01); B05D 1/28 (2006.01); B05D 5/06 (2006.01); B05D 1/00 (2006.01); B05D 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 19/00 (2013.01); B05C 1/0826 (2013.01); B05C 1/14 (2013.01); B05D 1/28 (2013.01); B05D 5/06 (2013.01); B05D 1/007 (2013.01); B05D 1/24 (2013.01); B05D 2252/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321197 A2 20030625; EP 1321197 A3 20040211; EP 1321197 B1 20070404; AT 358539 T 20070415; DE 10163025 A1 20030717; DE 50209859 D1 20070516

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070404

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071213

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070404

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071213

2009-01-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070404

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070404

2008-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FORDERUNG DER ANGEWAN

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070404

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070705

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070404

2008-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080107

2008-02-29 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070404

2008-01-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070704

2008-01-31 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070404

2008-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070404

2008-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070404

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070404

2007-11-30 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-11-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2007-10-31 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20070404

2007-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-09-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070904

2007-07-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070715

2007-07-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070704

2007-05-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2007-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50209859 P 20070516

2007-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2007-04-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-04-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070404

2007-04-04 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070404

2007-01-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER ANGEWAN

2006-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CUDAZZO, MARKUS, DIPL.-ING.(FH)

2006-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STROHBECK, ULRICH, DIPL.-ING.

2006-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BECKMANN, MARKUS DIPL.-ING (FH)

2006-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CASU, SASCHA

2004-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041021

2004-11-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040805

2004-04-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CUDAZZO, MARKUS, DIPL.-ING.

2004-04-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STROHBECK, ULRICH, DIPL.-ING.

2004-04-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BECKMANN, MARKUS DIPL.-ING (FH)

2004-04-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CASU, SASCHA

2004-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2004-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05D 1/28 A

2004-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05C 19/00 B

2004-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05C 1/08 B

2004-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05C 1/14 B

2004-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01D 1/06 B

2004-02-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05D 1/40 B

2003-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DERANGEWAND

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO