Global Patent Index - EP 1321201 A2

EP 1321201 A2 2003-06-25 - Method of manufacturing by hydroforming

Title (en)

Method of manufacturing by hydroforming

Title (de)

Fertigungsverfahren mittels Innenhochdruckumformung

Title (fr)

Méthode de fabrication par hydroformage

Publication

EP 1321201 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02024793 A

Priority

DE 10162393 A

Abstract (en)

The deforming process involves inserting a blank between tool parts, closing the deforming tool, deforming under pressure and stamping out a through aperture in the component wall. This is achieved by the use of an insert element (6) to create the through aperture and leaving it in place for plastic deformation to join it positively to the component.

Abstract (de)

Nach der Herstellung eines Innenhochdruckumformbauteils (4) wird bei im Innenhochdruckumformwerkzeug (2) verbleibenden Innenhochdruckumformbauteil (4) ein Verbindungs- bzw. Befestigungselement (6) in das Innenhochdruckumformbauteil (4) eingestanzt und anschließend wird das Verbindungs- bzw. Befestigungselement (6) plastisch verformt, so dass es formschlüssig mit dem Innenhochdruckumformbauteil (4) verbunden ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 26/02; B23P 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/02 (2011.01); B21D 26/023 (2011.01); B21D 26/035 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/023 (2013.01); B21D 26/035 (2013.01); B21D 39/034 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321201 A2 20030625; EP 1321201 A3 20030813; EP 1321201 B1 20040811; DE 10162393 A1 20030703

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141107

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141107

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141107

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50200798

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131127

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131127

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131115

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131128

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-02-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50200798 P 20040916

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-08-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI