Global Patent Index - EP 1321202 A2

EP 1321202 A2 2003-06-25 - Manufacturing method and internal high pression forming tool for carrying out the manufacturing method

Title (en)

Manufacturing method and internal high pression forming tool for carrying out the manufacturing method

Title (de)

Fertigungsverfahren und Innenhochdruckumformwerkzeug zur Durchführung des Fertigungsverfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication et dispositif de formage à haute pression interne pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1321202 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02024794 A

Priority

DE 10162394 A

Abstract (en)

The deforming process involves producing an internal thread in the component (3) produced by internal high-pressure deformation. During the forging process and the production of the internal thread, the component remains in the internal high-pressure deforming tool (1, 2). This thread maybe produced by a tool sector (8) of the forging tool (5) on one of the other sectors (6, 7)

Abstract (de)

In eine Wandung eines durch Innenhochdruckumformung hergestellten Bauteils (3) wird eine Durchgangsöffnung gestanzt und anschließend wird in der Durchgangsöffnung ein Innengewinde (14) hergestellt, wobei das Bauteil beim Stanzen und der Herstellung des Innengewindes im Innenhochdruckumformwerkzeug(1,2) verbleibt. <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 26/02; B21D 28/28; B21H 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321202 A2 20030625; EP 1321202 A3 20040421; EP 1321202 B1 20050216; DE 10162394 A1 20030703

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141107

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141107

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141107

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50202272

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131127

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131127

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131115

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131128

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-02-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-12-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50202272 P 20050324

2005-03-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-03-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050216

2005-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-02-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-01-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040311

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-04-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI