Global Patent Index - EP 1321203 A2

EP 1321203 A2 2003-06-25 - Forming press

Title (en)

Forming press

Title (de)

Umformpresse

Title (fr)

Presse de formage

Publication

EP 1321203 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02027171 A

Priority

DE 10162440 A

Abstract (en)

The deforming press includes an appropriately-shaped shaping cavity (9) to create a bulge (8) on the tubular workpiece (7), with a counter-holder (10) taken into the cavity in the deforming direction to control the deformation rate and deformation depth. A slide (12) in the side opposite the counter-holder can control the flow of material towards the bulge.

Abstract (de)

Es handelt sich um ein Umformwerkzeug mit einem Formraum (1) zum Herstellen von metallischen Werkstücken im Wege einer wirkmedienunterstützten Warmumformung. Das Werkzeugoberteil (2) weist zur Erzeugung einer Ausformung (8) an dem entstehenden rohrförmigen Werkstück (7) eine der Ausformung entsprechende Formausnehmung (9) mit einem in der Formausnehmung in Ausformrichtung geführten Gegenhalter (10) auf, der die Ausformgeschwindigkeit und Ausformtiefe der entstehenden Ausformung kontrolliert. Außerdem kann auf der dem Gegenhalter gegenüberliegenden Seite ein Schieber (12) vorgesehen sein, um den Werkstofffluss in Richtung der entstehenden Ausformung zu steuern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 26/02; B21C 37/15; B21J 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 37/29 (2006.01); B21D 26/037 (2011.01); B21D 26/047 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 22/025 (2013.01); B21C 37/294 (2013.01); B21D 26/037 (2013.01); B21D 26/047 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321203 A2 20030625; EP 1321203 A3 20050309; EP 1321203 B1 20070801; DE 10162440 A1 20030703; DE 50210587 D1 20070913

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141205

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141205

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150831

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141205

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50210587

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131230

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131219

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131218

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080506

2008-01-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-09-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50210587 P 20070913

2007-08-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-08-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-02-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070112

2005-11-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-05-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050318

2005-03-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2005-03-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2004-11-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO