Global Patent Index - EP 1321204 A2

EP 1321204 A2 2003-06-25 - Method of making motor vehicle parts

Title (en)

Method of making motor vehicle parts

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen von Kfz-Bauteilen

Title (fr)

Méthode de fabrication des éléments de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1321204 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02027172 A

Priority

DE 10162441 A

Abstract (en)

Production of vehicle components, especially gear parts, chassis parts, drive parts and engine parts, made from aluminum or aluminum alloys comprises: forming an intermediate or final mold from a starting mold in a deforming tool; and tempering to control the material flow in the solidification process by introducing and/or removing heat. <??>Preferred Features: A heated and/or cooled starting mold is used. The starting mold is a metal plate, a hollow green body or a semi-finished material, such as a tube. The starting mold is made from an aluminum magnesium alloy containing 3-5 wt.% magnesium (Mg), up to 0.2 wt.% zirconium (Zr), up to 0.15 wt.% manganese (Mn), up to 0.3 wt.% titanium (Ti) and a balance of aluminum (Al).

Abstract (de)

Es handelt sich um ein Verfahren zum Herstellen von Kfz-Bauteilen aus metallischen Werkstoffen im Wege einer wirkmediumunterstützten Warmumformung, wonach in einem Umformwerkzeug mit einem Formraum aus einer Ausgangsform (Rohling) eine Endform (Bauteil) erzeugt wird und zur Steuerung des Werkstoffflusses Formraumbereiche gezielt durch Wärmezufuhr und/oder Wärmeabfuhr temperiert werden.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 26/02; B21J 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/02 (2011.01); B21D 26/021 (2011.01); B21J 1/06 (2006.01); B21J 5/02 (2006.01); B21J 5/08 (2006.01); B21K 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/021 (2013.01); B21D 37/16 (2013.01); B21D 53/88 (2013.01); B21J 1/06 (2013.01); B21J 5/02 (2013.01); B21J 5/08 (2013.01); B21K 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321204 A2 20030625; EP 1321204 A3 20050309; DE 10162441 A1 20030703

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070424

2007-02-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070112

2005-11-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-05-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050318

2005-03-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2005-03-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2004-11-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO