Global Patent Index - EP 1321227 A1

EP 1321227 A1 2003-06-25 - A polishing method and device using magnetorheological fluid

Title (en)

A polishing method and device using magnetorheological fluid

Title (de)

Poliervorrichtung und Verfahren mit magnetorheologisher Flüssigkeit

Title (fr)

Appareil et méthode de polissage utilisant un fluide magnétorhéologique

Publication

EP 1321227 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01130155 A

Priority

EP 01130155 A

Abstract (en)

A polishing system comprising one or more magnetic units able to produce a magnetic field is provided. The magnetic units may cause a polishing material to become plasticized and the plasticized material is able to polish a surface of a work piece. The polishing material may intermittently and repeatedly contact with the surface for polishing. A method for engraving or embossing a predefined pattern in a surface during magneto-rheological polishing of the surface is also provided <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 1/00; B24B 37/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 1/00 (2006.01); B24B 37/04 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 37/04 (2013.01); B24B 1/005 (2013.01); B24B 37/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XDY] US 5577948 A 19961126 - KORDONSKY WILLIAM I [BY], et al
  • [Y] DE 2822342 A1 19791206 - FIZ TECH I AKAD NAUK
  • [A] US 6146243 A 20001114 - IMAHASHI TAKAHIRO [JP]
  • [A] UMEHARA N ET AL: "FUNDAMENTAL PROPERTIES OF MAGNETIC FLUID GRINDING WITH A FLOATING POLISHER", JOURNAL OF MAGNETISM AND MAGNETIC MATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, VOL. 122, NR. 1 / 3, PAGE(S) 428-431, ISSN: 0304-8853, XP000362591
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section PQ Week 198215, Derwent World Patents Index; Class P61, AN 1982-E2698E, XP002199247

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321227 A1 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031229

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI