Global Patent Index - EP 1321229 A1

EP 1321229 A1 2003-06-25 - Method for forming a bore

Title (en)

Method for forming a bore

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Bohrung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour l'usinage d'une forure

Publication

EP 1321229 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01130399 A

Priority

EP 01130399 A

Abstract (en)

When not exposed to stress, the hole (1) has an initial shape (2),and, in an operating state, has a nominal shape diverging from the initial shape. The hole is deformed as cylindrical nominal shape and initial shape. The deforming process is carried out by a honing appliance on a spindle. Up to four honing stones are used with separately controlled pressures

Abstract (de)

Bohrungen, insbesondere Zylinderbohrungen einer Hubkolbenmaschine, sind im Betriebszustand verformt. Ein Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Bohrung (1), die in unbelastetem Zustand eine Ausgangsform (2) aufweist und im Betriebszustand eine von der Ausgangsform (2) abweichende Sollform (3), umfaßt die Ermittlung der Verformung einer Bohrung (1) mit Sollform (3) im Betriebszustand. Mittels der Sollform (3) und der ermittelten Verformung wird die Ausgangsform (2) ermittelt und die Bohrung (1) wird durch ein Bearbeitungsverfahren in die Ausgangsform (2) gebracht. Die nach dem Verfahren hergestellte Ausgangsform (2) nimmt im Betriebszustand die gewünschte Sollform (3) an. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 33/02; B24B 33/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 33/06 (2006.01); B24B 33/02 (2006.01); B24B 33/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 33/088 (2013.01); B24B 33/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321229 A1 20030625; EP 1321229 B1 20090408; DE 50114827 C5 20170524; DE 50114827 D1 20090520; JP 2003200340 A 20030715; US 2003120374 A1 20030626

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-12-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-24 [REG DE R206] AMENDED PATENT SPECIFICATION

- Document: DE 50114827

2017-04-19 [REG DE R050] EXAMING DIVISION/FEDERAL PATENT COURT DECISION LIMITING PATENT NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50114827

2017-02-20 [REG DE R046] LIMITATION REQUEST VALIDLY FILED

- Document: DE 50114827

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-08-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100708 AND 20100714

2010-03-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100111

2010-03-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090708

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090719

2009-05-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50114827 P 20090520

2009-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2009-04-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEHRING GMBH & CO. KG

2008-11-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR FORMING A BORE

2005-03-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050117

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-11-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030929

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI