Global Patent Index - EP 1321232 A1

EP 1321232 A1 2003-06-25 - Grinding or milling device and method of use of said grinding or milling device

Title (en)

Grinding or milling device and method of use of said grinding or milling device

Title (de)

Schleif- oder Fräsvorrichtung und Verfahren zum Betrieb einer Schleif- oder Fräsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de polissage ou de fraisage et méthode d'utilisation de ce dispositif de polissage ou de fraisage

Publication

EP 1321232 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02020380 A

Priority

DE 10162425 A

Abstract (en)

The grinding or milling device (1) has a rotating tool (2) with a center of rotation (3) and at least one cutting element (4). There is a system (6) for supplying a fluid such as air to the center of rotation of the tool. The tool has at least one channel (7) in it connecting the center of rotation to the cutting element for the supply of air.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Bearbeitungsvorrichtung (1), insbesondere Schleif- oder Fräsvorrichtung, vorzugsweise zum Planieren von Steinen, mit einem rotierenden Werkzeug (2), das ein Drehzentrum (3) aufweist sowie mindestens ein Schneidelement (4), das an einem vom Drehzentrum (3) entfernten Ort angeordnet ist, wobei das rotierende Werkzeug (2) mittels einer Spindel (5) gelagert und drehangetrieben ist. Des weiteren betrifft die Erfindung ein Verfahren zum Betreiben der Bearbeitungsvorrichtung. Zur Verbesserung der Wärmeabfuhr und zur Vermeidung von Verunreinigungen ist erfindungsgemäß vorgesehen, dass die Vorrichtung (1) Mittel (6) aufweist, mit denen ein Fluid, insbesondere Luft, zum Drehzentrum (3) des Werkzeugs (2) geleitet werden kann, und dass das Werkzeug (2) weiterhin mindestens einen Fluidkanal (7) aufweist, der das Drehzentrum (3) des Werkzeugs (2) mit dem mindestens einen Schneidelement (4) fluidisch verbindet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 7/06; B24B 55/02; B24D 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 55/02 (2006.01); B24D 7/06 (2006.01); B24D 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 55/02 (2013.01); B24D 7/06 (2013.01); B24D 7/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321232 A1 20030625; EP 1321232 B1 20090311; AT 424969 T 20090315; DE 10162425 A1 20030710; DE 50213346 D1 20090423; ES 2320633 T3 20090527

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171003

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20170831

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170926

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-09-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-03-23 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: KELLER HCW GMBH

- Effective date: 20120312

2012-02-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KELLER HCW GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: NOVOCERIC TRANSPORTANLAGEN GMBH, 97638 MELLRICHSTADT, DE

- Document: DE 50213346

- Effective date: 20120102

2012-02-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50213346

- Representative's name: ADVOTEC. PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120102

2012-01-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50213346

- Representative's name: ADVOTEC. PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2011-11-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: KEKKER GCW GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20111007

2011-10-31 [REG CH PFUS] MERGER

- Owner name: KELLER HCW GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: NOVOCERIC TRANSPORTANLAGEN GMBH, DE

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090311

2011-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090311

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090912

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090912

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090912

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090612

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090912

2010-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-02-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091214

2010-01-29 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090611

2010-01-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090311

2009-11-30 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090311

2009-10-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090311

2009-10-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090311

2009-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090824

2009-10-14 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2009-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090611

2009-08-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2009-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090311

2009-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090311

2009-05-27 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2320633 T3

2009-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FREI PATENTANWALTSBUERO AG

2009-04-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50213346 P 20090423

2009-04-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2009-03-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2009-03-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-08-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: GRINDING OR MILLING DEVICE AND METHOD OF USE OF SAID GRINDING OR MILLING DEVICE

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031103

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI