Global Patent Index - EP 1321235 A2

EP 1321235 A2 2003-06-25 - Clamping device

Title (en)

Clamping device

Title (de)

Zwingeneinrichtung

Title (fr)

Serre-joint

Publication

EP 1321235 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02025135 A

Priority

DE 20120033 U

Abstract (en)

A building construction clamp retains panels in place while concrete sets. The clamp is fabricated as a profile that surrounds the spindle thread on three sides, leaving one side open. The first shank is joined to a profiled element to the clamp frame. The profile at least partly surrounds the frame at least partly as seen in cross section. The second shank can be repositioned in a longitudinal sliding action using a second connecting profile partially surrounding the clamp frame. The interior thread element is connected to the clamp frame open side to the second connector profile.

Abstract (de)

Eine Zwingeneinrichtung (10), insbesondere Schalzwinge, mit einem Zwingenträger (12), einer drehbar am Zwingenträger (12) gelagerten Gewindespindel (14), die in einem Innengewindeelement (24) kämmt, einem ersten feststehenden Schenkel (20) und einem zweiten, verschieblich am Zwingenträger (12) gelagerten Schenkel (22), dessen Position durch Drehen der Gewindespindel (14) in Längsrichtung des Zwingenträgers (12) einstellbar ist, zeichnet sich dadurch aus, dass der Zwingenträger (12) als die Gewindespindel (14) zumindest dreiseitig umgebendes Profil mit einer offenen Seite ausgebildet ist, der erste Schenkel (20) über ein erstes Anschlussprofilelement (26) an den Zwingenträger (12) angeschlossen ist, das den Zwingenträger (12) zumindest bereichsweise im Querschnitt formschlüssig umgibt, der zweite Schenkel (22) über ein zweites Anschlussprofilelement (28) an den Zwingenträger (12) längsverschieblich angeschlossen ist, das den Zwingenträger (12) zumindest bereichsweise im Querschnitt formschlüssig umgibt, und das Innengewindeelement (24) über die offene Seite des Zwingenträgers (12) an das zweite Anschlussprofilelement (28) angeschlossen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/10 (2006.01); B25B 1/10 (2006.01); B25B 1/12 (2006.01); B28B 7/00 (2006.01); E04G 17/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 17/12 (2013.01); B25B 1/103 (2013.01); B25B 1/125 (2013.01); B25B 5/102 (2013.01); B28B 7/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 20120033 U1 20020228; AT 439945 T 20090915; DE 50213780 D1 20091001; EP 1321235 A2 20030625; EP 1321235 A3 20060308; EP 1321235 A8 20040707; EP 1321235 B1 20090819

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131109

2014-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131109

2014-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 439945 T

- Effective date: 20131109

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20121122

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121123

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100520

2009-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2009-10-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50213780 P 20091001

2009-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2008-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080123

2006-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2006-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060830

2006-08-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WILHELM LAYHER VERWALTUNGS-GMBH

2006-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2006-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2006-03-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B25B 5/10 20060101AFI20030310BHEP

2006-03-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E04G 17/12 20060101ALI20060118BHEP

2003-10-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DER ERFINDER HAT AUF SEINE NENNUNG VERZICHTET.

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI