Global Patent Index - EP 1321238 A2

EP 1321238 A2 2003-06-25 - Connection means for an electrically operated screwdriver

Title (en)

Connection means for an electrically operated screwdriver

Title (de)

Verbindungsvorrichtung für einen elektrisch angetriebenen Schraubenzieher

Title (fr)

Dispositif de connexion pour tournevis électrique

Publication

EP 1321238 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02016457 A

Priority

DE 20119945 U

Abstract (en)

The chucks of the electrically driven screw driver comprise a socket device (30) with a polygonal opening (31) at the lower end for the insertion of the tool (70, 71) and a plug segment (32) at the opposite end for being joined to the housing, axially movable accommodated in a sleeve (40). For tool exchange the sleeve (40) is pushed against the forces of a spring (50) towards the housing, facilitating easy access to the bit (70, 71), which is additionally surrounded by a ring-shaped magnet (42) in order to hold the screw during the process of tightening or loosening.

Abstract (de)

Eine Verbindungsvorrichtung für einen elektrisch angetriebenen Schraubenzieherkopf (70) weist eine in der Hauptsteckachse (30) vorgesehenen Bohrung auf, eine mit einer axialen Durchbohrung (41) versehenen Buchse (40), eine Feder (50), eine Ringsicherung (60) und einem Magneten (42), wobei die Hauptsteckachse (30) ein Einsteckende (32) und einen Mittelabschnitt (33) hat, um den herum die Feder (50) und die Buchse (40) durch die Ringsicherung (60) in Position gehalten werden und wobei der Magnet (42) vor der axialen Durchbohrung (41) der Buchse (40) mit Hilfe einer Ringscheibe (43) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 23/00; B25B 23/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 15/00 (2006.01); B25B 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/0035 (2013.01); B25B 15/001 (2013.01); B25B 23/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321238 A2 20030625; EP 1321238 A3 20051116

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2006-08-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-07-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2005-11-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI