Global Patent Index - EP 1321244 A1

EP 1321244 A1 2003-06-25 - Tool holder for percussion tool

Title (en)

Tool holder for percussion tool

Title (de)

Schlagwerkzeugaufnahme

Title (fr)

Porte-outil pour outil à percussion

Publication

EP 1321244 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02406087 A

Priority

DE 10163176 A

Abstract (en)

The tool receiver (1) of a striking tool (2) with a tool guide (3) has at least one locking body (4) for a tool. There is at least one stop body (7) which can be offset through the insertion end (5) of the tool against the force of a spring (6). The stop body can contact a stop surface (8) on the tool side of the insertion end.

Abstract (de)

Eine Werkzeugaufnahme (1) eines zumindest teilweise schlagenden Werkzeuggerätes (2) mit einer Werkzeugführung (3) mit zumindest einem Verriegelungskörper (4) zur Aufnahme eines Werkzeugs innerhalb einer beidseitig begrenzt axialen Bewegungslänge (X), wobei zumindest ein durch das Einsteckende (5) des Werkzeugs gegen die Kraft eines Federmittels (6) versetzbarer Anschlagkörper (7) vorhanden ist, welcher innerhalb der durch den Verriegelungskörper (4) verriegelten Bewegungslänge (X) mit einer geräteseitig orientierten Anschlagfläche (8) des Einsteckendes (5) kontaktierbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25D 17/08; B25D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23B 45/16 (2006.01); B25D 11/00 (2006.01); B25D 17/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 11/005 (2013.01); B25D 17/088 (2013.01); B25D 2217/0042 (2013.01); B25D 2250/131 (2013.01); B25D 2250/321 (2013.01); B25D 2250/371 (2013.01); Y10T 279/17068 (2013.01); Y10T 279/17094 (2013.01); Y10T 279/17752 (2013.01); Y10T 279/3487 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321244 A1 20030625; CN 1298472 C 20070207; CN 1426867 A 20030702; DE 10163176 A1 20030703; JP 2003205475 A 20030722; JP 4319401 B2 20090826; US 2003116334 A1 20030626; US 6820700 B2 20041123

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090917

2009-06-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090506

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031229

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO