Global Patent Index - EP 1321255 A2

EP 1321255 A2 2003-06-25 - Concrete block and method for the production thereof

Title (en)

Concrete block and method for the production thereof

Title (de)

Betonstein und Verfahren zur Herstellung desselben

Title (fr)

Bloc de béton et procédé pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 1321255 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02028375 A

Priority

DE 10163645 A

Abstract (en)

Concrete brick has a planar upper and lower side with bulging side surfaces. <??>An Independent claim is also included for a process for the production of a concrete brick comprising: preparing a fresh concrete containing 40-60% sand having a maximum grain size of 2 mm, 20-40% gravel having a maximum grain size of 8 mm and 10-30% binder; preparing a brick green body from the fresh concrete; pressing the green body so that at least one side surface bulges outward without tearing the concrete; and allowing the pressed green body to dry. <??>Preferred Features: The binder contains a plasticizer, preferably a tenside. The green body is pressed using a hot or heated plate.

Abstract (de)

Es werden ein Betonstein mit natursteinähnlichem Charakter und ein Verfahren zur Herstellung des Betonsteines beschrieben. Bei dem Verfahren wird ein Steinrohling aus einem Frischbeton mit einer speziellen Rezeptur hergestellt. Der Steinrohling wird dann zusammengepreßt, so daß ausgebauchte Seitenflächen erhalten werden. Danach läßt man den zusammengepreßten Steinrohling aushärten. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 3/00; B28B 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 3/00 (2006.01); B28B 11/10 (2006.01); E04C 1/39 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 1/395 (2013.01); B28B 3/00 (2013.01); B28B 11/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321255 A2 20030625; EP 1321255 A3 20041006; DE 10163645 A1 20030710

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050407

2005-08-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-06-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO