Global Patent Index - EP 1321257 A2

EP 1321257 A2 2003-06-25 - Process and device for producing building components

Title (en)

Process and device for producing building components

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines Bauelements

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication d'éléments de construction

Publication

EP 1321257 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02028539 A

Priority

DE 10163138 A

Abstract (en)

A mold (1) is lined with separating foil (4) and a mass (5) containing a bonding agent added to the heated separating foil. The mass vibrated for even distribution and is then dried and removed from the mold. The separating foil is exposed to a vacuum to mold it to the mold's shape. The mold contains pores (2) to which a vacuum-generator is connected.

Abstract (de)

Dargestellt und beschrieben wird ein einfaches Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Bauelements mit den folgenden Schritten Auskleiden einer Form (1) mit einer Trennfolie (4), Aufbringen einer Bindemittel enthaltenden Masse (5) auf die Trennfolie (4), Trocknen der Masse (5) und Ausschalen der Masse (5) aus der Form (1). Ferner wird eine Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines Bauelements mit einer Form (1) zur Aufnahme der zur Herstellung verwendeten, bindemittelhaltigen Masse (5) beschrieben, wobei die Form (1) Poren (2) aufweist, an die eine Unterdruckerzeugungseinrichtung angeschlossen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 7/36; B28B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 1/00 (2006.01); B28B 7/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 1/008 (2013.01); B28B 7/364 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321257 A2 20030625; EP 1321257 A3 20050223; DE 10163138 A1 20030710

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050824

2005-12-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-11-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2005-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO