Global Patent Index - EP 1321258 A2

EP 1321258 A2 2003-06-25 - Equipment for removing water and sediments from molds for producing single-layer cement tiles

Title (en)

Equipment for removing water and sediments from molds for producing single-layer cement tiles

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Entfernung von Wasser und Sedimenten aus Formen zum Herstellen von einschichtigen Zementfliesen

Title (fr)

Equipement pour évacuer l'eau et les sédiments de moules pour la fabrication de carreaux minces en ciment

Publication

EP 1321258 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02425765 A

Priority

IT FI20010240 A

Abstract (en)

For the purpose of sucking excess water out of molds, there are provided two settling containers (1A, 1B) operating alternately under a vacuum, each combined with its own inlet valves (8; 10), suction valves (7, 9) and discharge valves (11, 13); means (12) for simultaneously operating the said valves to switch the identical valves into the two different states, so that, in an alternating way, one container is brought into the suction state and the other into the discharge state. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 7/38; B08B 3/00; B28B 7/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 5/04 (2006.01); B28B 7/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 5/04 (2013.01); B28B 7/386 (2013.01)

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321258 A2 20030625; EP 1321258 A3 20040512; EP 1321258 B1 20060322; DE 60210040 D1 20060511; DE 60210040 T2 20070222; ES 2258138 T3 20060816; IT FI20010240 A1 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180105

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161228

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-11-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GE.BI.LON. GESTIONE BREVETTI & IMMOBILI LONGIN, IT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LONGINOTTI MECCANICA S.R.L., SESTO FIORENTINO, IT

- Document: DE 60210040

- Effective date: 20120920

2012-11-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GE.BI.LON. GESTIONE BREVETTI & IMMOBILI LONGIN, IT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LONGINOTTI MECCANICA S.R.L., SESTO FIORENTINO, FIRENZE, IT

- Document: DE 60210040

- Effective date: 20120920

2012-11-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60210040

- Representative's name: GLAWE DELFS MOLL - PARTNERSCHAFT VON PATENT- U, DE

- Effective date: 20120920

2012-11-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60210040

- Representative's name: GLAWE DELFS MOLL PARTNERSCHAFT MBB VON PATENT-, DE

- Effective date: 20120920

2007-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061227

2006-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2258138 T3

2006-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60210040 P 20060511

2006-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2005-07-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-02-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2005-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-05-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 28B 7/38 A

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 28B 7/46 B

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 08B 3/00 B

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO