Global Patent Index - EP 1321260 A2

EP 1321260 A2 2003-06-25 - Method and plant for forming ceramic tiles or slabs

Title (en)

Method and plant for forming ceramic tiles or slabs

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anlage zur Herstellung von keramischen Fliesen oder Platten

Title (fr)

Procédé et installation pour la fabrication de carreaux ou dalles en céramique

Publication

EP 1321260 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02080157 A

Priority

IT RE20010129 A

Abstract (en)

A method for forming ceramic tiles or slabs in a press provided with a loading tray, consisting of depositing in a prearranged and/or random manner into a hopper a mixture of powders of different characteristics in such a manner as to create in the hopper a mass of powders presenting veining variously disposed within the mass, said hopper having a discharge mouth of dimensions at least equal to the dimensions of the at least one cavity of the mould of the forming press, both in the carriage translation direction and in the direction perpendicular thereto; from said mass of powders withdrawing successive portions having, in the tray translation direction, a dimension equal to a fraction of the length of said hopper, and in the direction perpendicular thereto a dimension equal to the dimension of the hopper mouth, such as to withdraw an entire layer of said mass; depositing said layer into the interior of said at least one cavity, and pressing the powders. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 13/023 (2013.01); B28B 13/022 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT PT TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321260 A2 20030625; EP 1321260 A3 20040519; EP 1321260 B1 20060913; BR 0205304 A 20040720; CN 100333886 C 20070829; CN 1426882 A 20030702; DE 60214656 D1 20061026; ES 2271186 T3 20070416; IT RE20010129 A1 20030623; MX PA02012389 A 20041213

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20161206

- Year of fee payment: 15

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161125

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070614

2007-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2271186 T3

2007-02-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070226

2006-12-14 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061214

2006-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60214656 P 20061026

2006-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT PT TR

2006-09-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060913

2005-06-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050503

2005-06-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SACMI COOPERATIVA MECCANICI IMOLA SOCIETA' COOPERA

2005-02-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT PT TR

2004-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO