Global Patent Index - EP 1321277 A1

EP 1321277 A1 2003-06-25 - Process to protect dangerous areas of injection moulding machines

Title (en)

Process to protect dangerous areas of injection moulding machines

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Sichern von Gefahrenbereichen an Spritzgiessmaschinen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour protéger les zones dangereuses des presses à injecter

Publication

EP 1321277 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02027336 A

Priority

DE 10163443 A

Abstract (en)

A drive system for a moving part of the machine comprises several functional parts, the movements of at least two of which are monitored. Control of the area of movement allows access to this area only when the monitored moving functional parts are simultaneously in a condition in which movement of the moving machine component by the drive system is impossible.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein Verfahren zum Sichern eines Gefahrenbereichs einer Spritzgießmaschine, beispielsweise des Bereichs zwischen einer beweglichen und einer festen Formaufspannplatte (3, 16). Der Antrieb für die bewegliche Formaufspannplatte (3) umfaßt mehrere Funktionselemente, d.h. einen Motor (I), einen Zahnriemen (13), Spindelmuttern (2), die mit Spindeln (14) in Eingriff stehen, und Zahnhaltekupplungen (4). Erfindungsgemäß wird vorgeschlagen, mindestens zwei der Funktionselemente zu überwachen und den Zugang zum Gefahrenbereich nur dann freizugeben, wenn die überwachten Funktionselemente gleichzeitig in einem Zustand sind, in dem eine Bewegung der Formaufspannplatte (3) über den Antrieb nicht möglich ist. Vorzugsweise werden der Verriegelungszustand der Zahnkupplungen (4), in dem sie die Spindelmuttern (2) drehfest halten, und die Drehzahl des Motors (I) überwacht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29C 45/84

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 45/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 45/84 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] GEBAUER W ET AL: "ELEKTRISCH - ABER SICHER! ANFORDERUNGEN AN DI KONSTRUKTION ELEKTRISCHER SPRITZGIESSMASCHINEN", KUNSTSTOFFE, CARL HANSER VERLAG. MUNCHEN, DE, VOL. 91, NR. 12, PAGE(S) 44-47, ISSN: 0023-5563, XP001110752
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 05 14 September 2000 (2000-09-14)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 189 (M - 494) 3 July 1986 (1986-07-03)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI LU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321277 A1 20030625; EP 1321277 B1 20060823; AT 337158 T 20060915; DE 10163443 A1 20030717; DE 10163443 B4 20050324; DE 50207923 D1 20061005

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171211

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161231

2017-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161231

2017-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-08-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: KRAUSSMAFFEI TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 337158 T

- Effective date: 20160706

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-08-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KRAUSSMAFFEI TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KRAUSSMAFFEI TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, 80997 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50207923

- Effective date: 20130603

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50207923

- Representative's name: WILHELM, LUDWIG, DIPL.-PHYS., DE

- Effective date: 20130603

2013-06-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50207923

- Representative's name: WILHELM, LUDWIG, DIPL.-PHYS., DE

2013-01-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: KRAUSSMAFFEI TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 337158 T

- Effective date: 20121116

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061207

2007-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070524

2006-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50207923 P 20061005

2006-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2006-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI LU

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI LU

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031229

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO