Global Patent Index - EP 1321299 A2

EP 1321299 A2 2003-06-25 - Printing machine with inkjet printer or the like, particularly for decorative printing of deformable sheet-like products

Title (en)

Printing machine with inkjet printer or the like, particularly for decorative printing of deformable sheet-like products

Title (de)

Druckmaschine mit Tintenstrahldrucker oder dergleichen, insbesondere zum dekorativen Drucken von deformierbaren blattförmigen Produkten

Title (fr)

Machine à imprimer comprenant une imprimante à jet d'encre ou similaire, particulièrement pour d'impression décorative de produits déformables en forme de feuille

Publication

EP 1321299 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02024412 A

Priority

IT MI20012701 A

Abstract (en)

A printing machine with inkjet printer or the like, particularly for decorative printing of easily deformable sheet-like products such as fabrics, hides, synthetic films or other products, which comprises a main structure (2) that supports means (3) for supporting and moving the product (4) to be printed, which can be actuated in order to produce an advancement of the product along an advancement direction. The machine comprises at least one inkjet printing head (6), which can move on command with a reciprocating motion along a printing direction (7) that is substantially perpendicular to the product advancement direction (5) in order to print a region of the product that faces the printing head (6). The support and movement means (3) comprise a belt-type conveyor element (9) that runs along a path in which one portion faces the work area of the printing head and forms, with one of its faces, at least along that portion, a supporting surface for the product. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 3/407; B41J 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 3/407 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 3/4078 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321299 A2 20030625; EP 1321299 A3 20040519; IT MI20012701 A1 20030619

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060720

2005-08-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): ES IT

2005-03-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-02-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): ES IT

2004-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41J 3/407 A

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41J 13/08 B

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI