Global Patent Index - EP 1321310 A1

EP 1321310 A1 2003-06-25 - Test method for writing instruments

Title (en)

Test method for writing instruments

Title (de)

Prüfverfahren für Schreibgeräte

Title (fr)

Procédé de contrôle pour des instruments d'écriture

Publication

EP 1321310 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01890347 A

Priority

EP 01890347 A

Abstract (en)

The testing process involves moving the pen in a repeated motion relative to the paper plane and moving the paper (4) in a feed direction. The movements are so coordinated that a meandering line formed of straight sectors is created. The pen is moved, with the paper stationary, between two preset end points. The paper is advanced when the pen is at the end points.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Prüfen von Schreibgeräten, insbesondere Kugelschreibern, auf Papier, bei dem das Schreibgerät bezüglich der Papierebene in einer sich wiederholenden Bewegung geführt wird und das Papier in einer Vorschubrichtung bewegt wird. Dabei werden die Bewegungen so koordiniert, dass die erhaltene Linie einen Mäander bildet, der aus geradlinigen Strecken besteht. Die Erfindung betrifft auch eine Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B43K 7/00; B43L 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B43K 15/02 (2006.01); B43K 7/00 (2006.01); B43L 13/00 (2006.01); G01M 99/00 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B43K 7/00 (2013.01); B43L 13/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] DE 19711698 A1 19971030 - HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]
  • [Y] DE 3123264 A1 19820916 - HIKO WERNIGERODE SCHREIBGERAET [DD]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 05 30 June 1995 (1995-06-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 157 (M - 1236) 16 April 1992 (1992-04-16)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321310 A1 20030625; AU 2002365023 A1 20030709; AU 2002365023 B2 20080424; BR 0215236 A 20041116; BR 0215236 B1 20130122; CA 2470053 A1 20030703; CA 2470053 C 20110329; CN 100368208 C 20080213; CN 1606510 A 20050413; DE 60236203 D1 20100610; EP 1456038 A1 20040915; EP 1456038 B1 20100428; ES 2340989 T3 20100614; JP 2005512861 A 20050512; JP 4368199 B2 20091118; MX PA04006147 A 20041101; US 2005034515 A1 20050217; US 7171864 B2 20070206; WO 03053716 A1 20030703

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060726

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031229

- Countries: AL

2004-03-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031229

- Countries: LT

2004-03-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031229

- Countries: LV

2004-03-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031229

- Countries: MK

2004-03-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031229

- Countries: RO

2004-03-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031229

- Countries: SI

2004-03-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOCIETE BIC

2004-03-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SOCIETE BIC

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031219

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI