Global Patent Index - EP 1321311 A2

EP 1321311 A2 2003-06-25 - Universal moistening device for flaps

Title (en)

Universal moistening device for flaps

Title (de)

Universelle Befeuchtungsvorrichtung für Klappe

Title (fr)

Dispositif universel de mouillage de rabats

Publication

EP 1321311 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 02293156 A

Priority

FR 0116680 A

Abstract (en)

Device for moistening envelope flaps comprises at least a pair or transport rollers (18A), a separator (12) for separating the envelope flap from the body and a moistener (14A, 14B). Suction means (20) are placed just before the separator and act in conjunction with a sprung pressing finger (30) so that envelopes are pressed down towards the suction means so that the flap can be lifted away from the envelope allowing its passage through the separator without damage occurring.

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif d'humectage de volets d'enveloppes intégré à un module d'alimentation en articles de courrier et comportant successivement le long d'un chemin de transport de ces articles de courriers: au moins une paire de rouleaux d'entraînement (18A) pour transporter ces articles de courrier, un séparateur (12) pour séparer le volet du corps de l'enveloppe (10); un mouilleur (14A, 14B) pour humecter ce volet une fois le volet séparé du corps de l'enveloppe, et des moyens d'aspiration (20) disposés juste devant le séparateur et un doigt presseur (30) agissant à l'encontre de moyens ressort pour, en présence d'enveloppes à volets rabattus, plaquer l'enveloppe en direction de ces moyens d'aspiration et détacher le volet du corps de l'enveloppe et permettre ainsi son passage sous le séparateur sans bourrage ni contacts inopportuns avec le séparateur. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B43M 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B43M 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B43M 5/042 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 4450037 A 19840522 - GAVRONSKY GERMAN [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321311 A2 20030625; EP 1321311 A3 20031126; EP 1321311 B1 20060510; DE 60211291 D1 20060614; DE 60211291 T2 20070419; FR 2833885 A1 20030627; FR 2833885 B1 20040604; US 2003141019 A1 20030731; US 6893534 B2 20050517

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171211

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-07-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081215

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-04-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070213

2006-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60211291 P 20060614

2006-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2006-05-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-04-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEOPOST TECHNOLOGIES

2004-08-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2004-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040415

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-11-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO