Global Patent Index - EP 1321343 A1

EP 1321343 A1 2003-06-25 - Bellows of a passage between two articulated vehicles

Title (en)

Bellows of a passage between two articulated vehicles

Title (de)

Balg eines Überganges zwischen zwei gelenkig miteinander verbundenen Fahrzeugen

Title (fr)

Soufflet d'un passage entre deux véhicules articulés

Publication

EP 1321343 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02025843 A

Priority

DE 10162311 A

Abstract (en)

Bellows (1) for a passage between two vehicles hinged together comprises individual interconnected bellows elements (2-5) in the form of corrugations or folds aligned in the direction of the bellows longitudinal axis. <??>Preferred Features: The bellows elements are arranged next to each other perpendicular to the longitudinal axis so that the drawn out bellows has a conical shape. The individual bellows elements are stacked inside each other when pushed together. The ends of the bellows elements are held in a peripheral frame profile.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist ein Balg (1) eines Überganges zwischen zwei gelenkig miteinander verbundenen Fahrzeugen, wobei der Balg (1) einzelne, untereinander verbundene Balgelemente (2 bis 5) in Form von Wellen oder Falten aufweiste, wobei die Balgelemente (2 bis 5) in Richtung der Balglängsachse (50) ausgerichtet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 17/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 17/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 17/22 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 10162311 C1 20030403; EP 1321343 A1 20030625; EP 1321343 B1 20060322; NO 20025948 A 20030520; NO 20025948 D0 20021211; NO 323809 B1 20070709

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-11-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061227

2006-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060322

2006-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2006-03-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-03-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2005-07-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050602

2004-04-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI