Global Patent Index - EP 1321377 A1

EP 1321377 A1 2003-06-25 - Package for a water-soluble capsule

Title (en)

Package for a water-soluble capsule

Title (de)

Packung für eine wasserlösliche Kapsel

Title (fr)

Emballage pour une capsule soluble dans l'eau

Publication

EP 1321377 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02256147 A

Priority

GB 0128948 A

Abstract (en)

One or more water-soluble capsules containing a detergent composition in combination with a package containing said one or more water-soluble capsules, characterised in that the package comprises a flexible material and means a collapsible base portion which expands from a collapsed position to an expanded position when one or more capsules is/are placed on the base, and is collapsible when empty so as to make the package substantially flat.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 65/46; B65D 75/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/00 (2006.01); B65D 75/00 (2006.01); B65D 75/58 (2006.01); C11D 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/042 (2013.01); B65D 75/008 (2013.01); B65D 75/5805 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321377 A1 20030625; GB 0128948 D0 20020123

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-17 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20061106

2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNILEVER PLC

2006-07-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNILEVER N.V.

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030718

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI