Global Patent Index - EP 1321379 A1

EP 1321379 A1 2003-06-25 - Heat-shrinkable film packaging for bottles and process for manufacturing said packaging

Title (en)

Heat-shrinkable film packaging for bottles and process for manufacturing said packaging

Title (de)

Wärmeschrumpfbare Folienverpackung für Flaschen und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung

Title (fr)

Film thermoretractable pour bouteilles et procédé de fabrication de ce film

Publication

EP 1321379 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01830790 A

Priority

EP 01830790 A

Abstract (en)

A packaging for bottles made with a heat-shrinkable film, of the type divisible into submultiples or with an easy-opening feature, in which the series of incisions provided in the film, to obtain its opening in the required zones, are performed with the score cut method. There are described series of incisions consisting of two or more lines of aligned incisions, parallel and close one another, which allow to obtain a better directionality and a reduced tearing energy. The invention also includes the manufacturing process of said packaging and the score cut equipment apt to perform said lines of incisions in the heat-shrinkable film. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 71/00; B26F 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/28 (2006.01); B26F 1/20 (2006.01); B65B 53/00 (2006.01); B65B 53/02 (2006.01); B65D 71/00 (2006.01); B65D 71/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/08 (2013.01); B26F 1/20 (2013.01); B65D 75/5844 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 6105776 A 20000822 - MEILHON DANIEL [FR]

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321379 A1 20030625; EP 1321379 B1 20090527; AT 432228 T 20090615; AU 2002358159 A1 20030709; AU 2002358159 A8 20030709; BR 0207415 A 20040810; BR 0207415 B1 20140610; DE 60138818 D1 20090709; DK 1321379 T3 20090831; EP 1497198 A2 20050119; EP 1497198 B1 20090812; ES 2327490 T3 20091030; HR P20040640 A2 20051031; HR P20040640 B1 20160506; JP 2005512904 A 20050512; JP 4414227 B2 20100210; MX PA04005998 A 20051117; PL 202344 B1 20090630; PL 373488 A1 20050905; PT 1321379 E 20090805; RU 2004122096 A 20050227; RU 2314241 C2 20080110; WO 03053804 A2 20030703; WO 03053804 A3 20041104

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180105

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171130

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171018

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20171026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171113

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171016

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171115

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171016

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20171017

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171019

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-12-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20171108

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090527

2010-10-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091220

2010-09-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2010-07-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-05-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100302

2009-10-30 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2327490 T3

2009-10-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090527

2009-09-25 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20090402036

2009-09-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-08-31 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2009-08-05 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20090730

2009-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2009-07-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60138818 P 20090709

2009-06-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2009-05-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2009-05-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: LT LV MK RO

2009-05-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-05-13 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20031219

- Countries: LT

2009-05-13 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20031219

- Countries: LV

2009-05-13 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20031219

- Countries: MK

2009-05-13 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Payment date: 20031219

- Countries: RO

2008-12-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HEAT-SHRINKABLE FILM PACKAGING FOR BOTTLES AND PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING SAID PACKAGING

2007-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061006

2006-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061006

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031219

- Countries: LT

2004-03-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031219

- Countries: LV

2004-03-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031219

- Countries: MK

2004-03-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031219

- Countries: RO

2004-03-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031219

- Countries: SI

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031219

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI