Global Patent Index - EP 1321382 A1

EP 1321382 A1 2003-06-25 - Package comprising a plurality of plastic wrapped rolls of mineral wool insulation material

Title (en)

Package comprising a plurality of plastic wrapped rolls of mineral wool insulation material

Title (de)

Grossgebinde aus mehreren jeweils zu einer Rolle gewickelten, folienverpackten Dämmstoffbahnen aus Mineralwolle

Title (fr)

Conditionnement de plusieurs rouleaux de matériau isolant à base de laine minérale emballés individuellement sous film

Publication

EP 1321382 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02023601 A

Priority

DE 10152385 A

Abstract (en)

The pack consists of several webs of foil-packed insulating material. Two layers each consisting of 12 insulation rolls packed in a foil cover. The individual rolls and the multiple ones are compressed into a module of joint rolls in a manner that products the fibers, so that for a height of pack of between 2.30 and 2.50 m, and thickness of web of 100 to 240 mm, the ration of insulation surface to standing surface is between 50:1 and 115:1.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Großgebinde aus mehreren jeweils zu einer Rolle gewickelten, folienverpackten Dämmstoffbahnen werden zwei Lagen aus je 12 Dämmstoffrollen in einer Folienumhüllung verpackt, wobei die einzelne Rolle wie auch die mehreren jeweils zu einem Modul zusammengefassten Rollen derart faserschonend komprimiert sind, dass bei einer Höhe des Großgebindes zwischen 2,30 m und 2,50 m und einer Dicke der Dämmstoffbahn von 100 mm bis 240 mm das Verhältnis Dämmfläche m2/Standfläche m<2> des Großgebindes gleich etwa 50 : 1 bis etwa 115 : 1 beträgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 85/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 27/12 (2006.01); B65B 63/02 (2006.01); B65D 71/00 (2006.01); B65D 85/07 (2017.01); B65D 85/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/0096 (2013.01); B65B 27/12 (2013.01); B65B 63/026 (2013.01); B65D 85/07 (2018.01); B65D 85/46 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00012 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10152385 A1 20030508; DE 10152385 B4 20121122; AT 298713 T 20050715; DE 20221898 U1 20081127; DK 1321382 T3 20051010; EP 1321382 A1 20030625; EP 1321382 B1 20050629; ES 2244713 T3 20051216; PT 1321382 E 20051130

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-06 [REG SK MM4A] PATENT LAPSED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF MAINTENANCE FEES

- Document: SK E 236

- Effective date: 20101017

2010-06-29 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2010-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20091027

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20050629

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20050629

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091117

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091023

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-04-21 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20091111

2010-04-21 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20091111

2010-04-19 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20100415

2010-03-31 [PGFP BG] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20091028

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-01-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091027

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-01-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091015

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20091027

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-01-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20091028

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-01-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091027

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-01-29 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20091019

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-11-30 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20090921

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090925

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-11-30 [PGFP SK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Payment date: 20090921

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-01-05 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KNAUF INSULATION SA

2009-01-05 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ROCKWOOL INTERNATIONAL A/S

2009-01-05 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: URSA INTERNARIONAL GMBH

2008-11-05 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KNAUF INSULATION SA

- Effective date: 20060318

2008-11-05 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ROCKWOOL INTERNATIONAL A/S

- Effective date: 20060327

2008-11-05 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: URSA INTERNARIONAL GMBH

- Effective date: 20060329

2006-07-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KNAUF INSULATION SA

2006-07-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ROCKWOOL INTERNATIONAL A/S

2006-07-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: URSA INTERNARIONAL GMBH

2006-05-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KNAUF INSULATION SA

- Effective date: 20060318

2006-05-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ROCKWOOL INTERNATIONAL A/S

- Effective date: 20060327

2006-05-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: URSA INTERNARIONAL GMBH

- Effective date: 20060329

2006-05-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KNAUF INSULATION SA

- Effective date: 20060318

2006-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2244713 T3

2005-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: URS WEGMANN DIPL.-ING.

2005-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050922

2005-10-17 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051017

2005-10-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-10-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-09-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050929

2005-08-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-08-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50203491 P 20050804

2005-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-06-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2005-06-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-29 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050629

2004-11-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PACKAGE COMPRISING A PLURALITY OF PLASTIC WRAPPED ROLLS OF MINERAL WOOL INSULATION MATERIAL

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040123

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030403

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI