Global Patent Index - EP 1321383 A1

EP 1321383 A1 2003-06-25 - Refuse collection vehicle with grabbing means for refuse collection containers

Title (en)

Refuse collection vehicle with grabbing means for refuse collection containers

Title (de)

Müllsammelfahrzeug mit Klammeraufnahme für Müllsammelbehälter

Title (fr)

Véhicule de ramassage d'ordures avec dispositif de préhension pour poubelles

Publication

EP 1321383 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02027419 A

Priority

DE 20120464 U

Abstract (en)

The refuse collection vehicle has at least one component for monitoring the position of the clamp holder (32,34) for the waste bin (38) and for release of the bin after the clamp holder has reached a predetermined position. The monitoring component is an extension transmitter and/or a rotational angle transmitter. A semi-automatic control unit processes signals received from the positioning monitoring component. The vehicle may be a side loader or a front and side loader.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Müllsammelfahrzeug (10) mit Klammeraufnahme (32) für Müllsammelbehälter(38) mit einem Schüttungsgestänge (22,30), über das die Klammeraufnahme verfahrbar bzw. verschwenkbar ist. Erfindungsgemäß ist mindestens ein Stellungsüberwachungsglied zur Überwachung der Stellung der Klammeraufnahme und zur Freigabe des Müllsammelbehälters nach Erreichen einer vorbestimmten Stellung der Klammeraufnahme vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/04 (2006.01); B65F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/041 (2013.01); B65F 2003/023 (2013.01); B65F 2003/0279 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 20120464 U1 20020411; DE 50209824 D1 20070510; EP 1321383 A1 20030625; EP 1321383 B1 20070328

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141209

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150831

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141209

2015-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141209

2015-07-29 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-07-22 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50209824

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131230

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20131219

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20131227

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-02-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20131224

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131224

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080102

2007-09-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070607

2007-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50209824 P 20070510

2007-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB LU NL

2007-03-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB LU NL

2003-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO