Global Patent Index - EP 1321409 A1

EP 1321409 A1 2003-06-25 - Banknote store

Title (en)

Banknote store

Title (de)

Banknotenspeicher

Title (fr)

Magasin de stockage de billets

Publication

EP 1321409 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02258837 A

Priority

  • EP 02258837 A
  • EP 01310717 A

Abstract (en)

A banknote store (10, 12, 14, 16) comprises first and second drums (18, 20; 18, 22) mounted for rotation about respective axes on, respectively, first and second shafts (51), an elongate support strip (24; 26) which can be unwound from one of the drums onto the other of the drum, and vice versa, such that banknotes (60) can be supported in succession by the support strip while that is wound around at least one of the drums, coupling means (44, 46, 50) for coupling the shafts together, first biasing means (54) between the coupling means and the first drum and second biasing means (56; 58) between the coupling means and the second drum for allowing biased relative motion between each said drum and said coupling means, and for maintaining tension in the support strip. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/006 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41912 (2013.01); B65H 2402/54 (2013.01); B65H 2403/73 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1912 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321409 A1 20030625; EP 1321409 B1 20070328

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180102

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171220

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171212

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080102

2007-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2281496 T3

2007-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60219129 P 20070510

2007-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2007-03-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-02-14 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: DEESGBIT

- Effective date: 20061103

2006-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEI, INC.

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031218

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO