Global Patent Index - EP 1321411 A1

EP 1321411 A1 2003-06-25 - Method for the adjustment of the folding nips of a plurality of folding roller pairs.

Title (en)

Method for the adjustment of the folding nips of a plurality of folding roller pairs.

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Einstellung der Falzspaltenweite mehrerer Falzwalzenpaare.

Title (fr)

Méthode de réglage des intervalles de pliage de plusieurs paires de rouleaux plieurs.

Publication

EP 1321411 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01129502 A

Priority

EP 01129502 A

Abstract (en)

The sheet is passed between a pair of folding rollers (12,14). The folder roller (14) moves in relation to the other, for forming a folding nip. The folding nip width for each pair of folding rollers is detected based on which the movement of folding roller (14) connected kinematically to drive unit, is controlled. <??>An Independent claim is also included for sheet folding machine.

Abstract (de)

Bei dem Verfahren zur Einstellung der Falzspaltenweite mehrerer Falzwalzenpaare, die an einer Falzmaschine vorgesehen sind, werden die beiden Falzwalzen (12 bis 22) der Falzwalzenpaare in Kontakt miteinander gebracht. Dann wird ein Bogen zwischen den beiden Falzwalzen (12 bis 22) der Falzwalzenpaare durchgeführt, wodurch sich wenigstens eine der beiden Falzwalzen (12 bis 22) unter Bildung eines Falzspaltes bezüglich der anderen bewegt, wobei bei jedem Falzwalzenpaar ein der Falzspaltenweite entsprechender Messwert bei der Durchführung des Bogens erfasst wird. Schließlich werden die Falzspaltenweiten der einzelnen Falzwalzenpaare durch Verstellung der wenigstens einen bewegbaren Falzwalze (14 bis 22) mittels eines mit dieser kinematisch verbundenen Antriebs (42) basierend auf den entsprechenden erfassten Messwerten eingestellt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 45/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/144 (2013.01); B65H 45/147 (2013.01); B65H 2511/13 (2013.01); B65H 2511/22 (2013.01); B65H 2511/224 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/13 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2511/22 + B65H 2220/02

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321411 A1 20030625; EP 1321411 B1 20050511; DE 50106223 D1 20050616; JP 2003182931 A 20030703; JP 4123922 B2 20080723; US 2003109367 A1 20030612; US 6743161 B2 20040601

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171229

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151211

2016-09-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160831

2016-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151211

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141211

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-08-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50106223

2014-06-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50106223

- Representative's name: KROHER - STROBEL RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE PA, DE

2014-06-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50106223

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131218

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-05-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060214

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050908

2005-06-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50106223 P 20050616

2005-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-05-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR THE ADJUSTMENT OF THE FOLDING NIPS OF A PLURALITY OF FOLDING ROLLER PAIRS.

2004-04-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY LI

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031218

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI