Global Patent Index - EP 1321412 A2

EP 1321412 A2 2003-06-25 - Conical cross-wound bobbin and method for winding the yarn package of a conical cross-wound bobbin

Title (en)

Conical cross-wound bobbin and method for winding the yarn package of a conical cross-wound bobbin

Title (de)

Konische Kreuzspule und Verfahren zur Bildung des Wickelkörpers einer konischen Kreuzspule

Title (fr)

Bobine conique à enroulement croisé et procédé pour la formation du paquet de fil d'une telle bobine conique

Publication

EP 1321412 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02025845 A

Priority

DE 10162778 A

Abstract (en)

The process creates a crossing angle between 15-28 degrees in the middle zone (30), which is produced with this angle across more than 50% of the total winding width. The crossing angle in the middle section is at least 8 degrees smaller than the maximum angle in the edge zones (28,29). Yarn tension is reduced as the package diameter increases. <??>An Independent claim is made for the resulting crosswound package.

Abstract (de)

Das Verfahren dient der Bildung des Wickelkörpers einer konischen Kreuzspule aus Rotorgarn. Die Fadenführung erfolgt derart, daß in einer mittleren Zone innerhalb eines Spulenhubes der Kreuzungswinkel α kleiner als 28° und kleiner als im übrigen Teil des Spulenhubes ausgeführt wird. Die Wickelbreite, auf der der Faden mit kleinerem Kreuzungswinkel αM verlegt wird, nimmt mehr als 60% der gesamten Wickelbreite BWG ein. Die erfindungsgemäß hergestellten konischen Kreuzspulen zeichnen sich durch hohe Lauflängen, stabilen Aufbau, gute Dichteverteilung sowie hervorragende Ablaufeigenschaften aus. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 55/04; B65H 54/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/38 (2006.01); B65H 55/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/385 (2013.01); B65H 55/04 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321412 A2 20030625; EP 1321412 A3 20030917; EP 1321412 B1 20060405; CN 1269711 C 20060816; CN 1426947 A 20030702; DE 10162778 A1 20030703; DE 50206302 D1 20060518; US 2003116673 A1 20030626; US 6886771 B2 20050503

INPADOC legal status


2018-09-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SAURER SPINNING SOLUTIONS GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SAURER GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG, 42897 REMSCHEID, DE

- Document: DE 50206302

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171130

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171207

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: LEVERKUSER STRASSE 65, 42897 REMSCHEID (DE)

2014-06-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER AND PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANW, CH

2014-06-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SAURER GERMANY GMBH AND CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SAURER GMBH AND CO. KG, DE

2013-11-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SAURER GERMANY GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG, 42897 REMSCHEID, DE

- Document: DE 50206302

- Effective date: 20130918

2013-11-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SAURER SPINNING SOLUTIONS GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG, 42897 REMSCHEID, DE

- Document: DE 50206302

- Effective date: 20130918

2011-10-19 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20110610

2008-07-30 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG

2008-05-28 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: RIETER INGOLSTADT GMBH

- Effective date: 20070102

2007-07-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG

2007-02-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: RIETER INGOLSTADT SPINNEREIMASCHINENBAU AG

- Effective date: 20070102

2006-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50206302 P 20060518

2006-04-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2006-04-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060405

2004-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2004-05-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040317

2003-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI