Global Patent Index - EP 1321413 A2

EP 1321413 A2 2003-06-25 - Splice for a multi-strand wire rope and method for making it

Title (en)

Splice for a multi-strand wire rope and method for making it

Title (de)

Langspleissverbindung für ein Drahtseil mit mehreren Litzen sowie Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung

Title (fr)

Epissure pour câble métallique à torons multiples et procédé pour sa production

Publication

EP 1321413 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02450284 A

Priority

AT 9682001 U

Abstract (en)

Cords of one rope section (1') are employed as laid-in cords (3) in place of a central core of another rope section (1). The laid-in cords are covered by wrapping a string-like element (5) round them. The element is preferably a plastic rope with a circular cross section and a weight of 0.7-0.8 kg/dm3. An Independent claim is also included for the manufacture of the splice connection.

Abstract (de)

Langspleißverbindung für ein mehrlitziges Drahtseil bzw. Verfahren zur Herstellung einer solchen Langspleißverbindung, wobei zum Verbinden von zwei Seilabschnitten (1, 1') Litzen eines Seilabschnitts (1') anstelle einer mittigen Einlage eines anderen Seilabschnitts (1) als Einlegelitzen (3) vorgesehen sind, die Einlegelitzen (3) eine Hüllschicht (5') aufweisen, und als Hüllschicht eine Umwicklung aus einem linearen, schnurförmigen Element (5) vorgesehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 69/06; D07B 1/16; D07B 7/16; D07B 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 69/06 (2006.01); D07B 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 69/06 (2013.01); D07B 7/169 (2015.07); D07B 7/165 (2013.01); D07B 7/167 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2052 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2055 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2061 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. D07B 2201/2052 + D07B 2801/24
  2. D07B 2201/2055 + D07B 2801/24
  3. D07B 2201/2061 + D07B 2801/24

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

AT 5700 U1 20021025; EP 1321413 A2 20030625; EP 1321413 A3 20041124

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050101

2005-09-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-08-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-11-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2004-11-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65H 69/06 A

2004-11-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 07B 1/16 B

2004-11-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 07B 7/16 B

2004-11-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 07B 9/00 B

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO