Global Patent Index - EP 1321416 A1

EP 1321416 A1 2003-06-25 - Guiding rails arrangement for elevators

Title (en)

Guiding rails arrangement for elevators

Title (de)

Führungsschienenanordnung für Aufzüge

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour rails de guidage d'ascenseurs

Publication

EP 1321416 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02027383 A

Priority

  • EP 02027383 A
  • EP 01811247 A

Abstract (en)

The guide rail fitting system is for guide rails (6, 7, 11, 12, 13, 14), which are fitted to an assembly bracket (1) fixed to the door-side wall (20) of the shaft. Some of these guide rails (11, 12, 13, 14) are for two counterweights (15, 16). These rails are held on the bracket by double claws and only one screw.

Abstract (de)

Mit dieser Führungsschienenanordnung kann das kostspielige und zeitaufwendige Ausrichten der Führungsschienen für Gegengewicht und Aufzugskabine vermieden werden. Zu diesem Zweck sind die Führungsschienen (6,7,11,12,13,14) an einem mit der türseitigen Schachtwand (20) verbundenen Montagebügel (1) befestigt. In einer bevorzugten Ausführung sind Führungsschienen (11,12,13,14) für zwei Gegengewichte (15,16) vorgesehen, wobei die Führungsschienen (11,12,13,14) mittels Doppelklauen, die nur mit einer Schraube am Montagebügel (1) befestigt sind, gehalten werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 7/024 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321416 A1 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2011-01-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100723

2010-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100312

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030512

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO