Global Patent Index - EP 1321420 A1

EP 1321420 A1 2003-06-25 - Shaft module for a lift

Title (en)

Shaft module for a lift

Title (de)

Schachtsmodul für Aufzug

Title (fr)

Module de cage pour ascenseur

Publication

EP 1321420 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02027354 A

Priority

  • EP 02027354 A
  • EP 01811258 A

Abstract (en)

The lift shaft has at least two prefabricated modular track elements (21) for the lift-cabin. A coupling is fixed to the top end of an underneath track element, Another coupling (110) is fixed to the bottom end of a top track. The couplings consist preferably of metal and cast in concrete. One coupling contains a centering hole (111) and a recess (104). A cable preferably runs through a hole (109) in the coupling

Abstract (de)

Der modular aufgebaute Aufzugsschacht ist mit Führungen für eine Aufzugskabine versehen und umfasst mindestens zwei vorfabrizierte modulare Fahrbahnelemente mit Fahrbahnen (11, 21) für die Aufzugskabine. An dem oberen Ende einer unteren Fahrbahn (11) eines Fahrbahnelements ist ein erstes Kopplungsstück (120) und an dem unteren Ende einer oberen Fahrbahn (21) eines nächsten Fahrbahnelements ein zweites Kopplungsstück (110) fixiert. Beide Kopplungsstücke (110, 120) sind ausgestaltet, um einen fluchtenden Übergang zwischen diesen zwei Fahrbahnen (11, 21) zu bilden. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 11/00; E04F 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 17/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321420 A1 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-08-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160719

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO