Global Patent Index - EP 1321421 A1

EP 1321421 A1 2003-06-25 - Base frame which forms a base module for an elevator shaft

Title (en)

Base frame which forms a base module for an elevator shaft

Title (de)

Schachtgrubenwanne als Basismodul für einen Aufzugsschacht

Title (fr)

Socle en forme de bac qui constitue le module de base pour une cage d'ascenseur

Publication

EP 1321421 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02027366 A

Priority

  • EP 02027366 A
  • EP 01811259 A

Abstract (en)

The lift shaft rests, at least partly, on a concrete prefabricated trough (60) the top at least of which comprises a base plate for a building. The trough serves as inner shuttering for casting the building base plate where it remains to act as base module for the lift shaft. The lift shaft has a first modular track element (70) with regulating screws (62). The trough has an integrated positioning bolt (71) and has a peripheral sealing-flange (63).

Abstract (de)

Der Aufzugsschacht ist mit Mitteln zur Führung einer Aufzugskabine versehen und stützt sich auf eine Gebäudebodenplatte aus Beton, in die eine Wanne (60) eingegossen ist, die als Schalung beim Giessen der Gebäudebodenplatte dient. Ein solches als Wanne (60) ausgebildetes Basismodul weist ein geringes Gewicht und ein kleines Volumen für Transport und Montage auf und bringt eine drastische Reduktion der Baudauer und der Baukosten mit sich, wobei insbesondere kein spezielles Hebezeug für grössere Lasten erforderlich ist. Zudem erfüllt ein solches Basismodul gleichzeitig Bau- und Aufzugsfunktionen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/0005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1321421 A1 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20161202

2016-08-17 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160722

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO