Global Patent Index - EP 1321425 A1

EP 1321425 A1 2003-06-25 - Telescopic boom for mobile crane

Title (en)

Telescopic boom for mobile crane

Title (de)

Teleskopausleger für einen Fahrzeugkran

Title (fr)

Flèche télescopique pour grue mobile

Publication

EP 1321425 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02026316 A

Priority

DE 20120121 U

Abstract (en)

The arm comprises an upper section part (12) which consists of several shell segments (12b-12d) having obtuse angles to each other. The shell segments have an outwardly curved shape. The welding joints (16) are located in the region of neutral zone of the base part and/or at least one telescopic part.

Abstract (de)

Teleskopausleger für einen Fahrzeugkran mit einem dreh- und schwenkbar lagerbaren Basisteil in dem mehrere zusammenschiebbare und ausfahrbare Teleskopteile gelagert sind, wobei das Basisteil und/oder mindestens ein Teleskopteil ein oberes Profilteil (12) und ein unteres Profilteil (14) aufweisen und das untere Profilteil aus mehreren aneinandergrenzenden Schalensegmenten (14a-d) besteht, die jeweils eine nach außen gekrümmte Form aufweisen; das obere Profilteil besteht aus mehreren, mit stumpfen Winkeln aneinander stoßenden Schalensegmenten (12a-12d,12f,12g), die eine nach außen gekrümmte Form haben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 23/687

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/687 (2006.01); B66C 23/693 (2006.01); B66C 23/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/701 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 20120121 U1 20020307; CA 2413969 A1 20030612; CA 2413969 C 20090224; CN 1319846 C 20070606; CN 1436716 A 20030820; DE 50209002 D1 20070201; EP 1321425 A1 20030625; EP 1321425 B1 20061220; EP 1496006 A2 20050112; EP 1496006 A3 20050202; ES 2273961 T3 20070516; JP 2003201088 A 20030715; KR 100893929 B1 20090421; KR 20030048361 A 20030619; US 2003106871 A1 20030612; US 6978907 B2 20051227

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-11-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151122

2017-03-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170301

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151121

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151121

2016-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151121

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-04-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MANITOWOC CRANE GROUP FRANCE SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MANITOWOC CRANE GROUP FRANCE SAS, ECULLY, FR

- Document: DE 50209002

- Effective date: 20150317

2015-04-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50209002

- Representative's name: SCHWABE SANDMAIR MARX, DE

- Effective date: 20150317

2015-04-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50209002

- Representative's name: SCHWABE SANDMAIR MARX PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANW, DE

- Effective date: 20150317

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-03-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50209002

- Representative's name: SCHWABE SANDMAIR MARX, DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-05-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MANITOWOC CRANE GROUP FRANCE SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GROVE U.S. LLC, SHADY GROVE, PA., US

- Document: DE 50209002

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-05-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50209002

- Representative's name: SCHWABE SANDMAIR MARX, DE

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-05-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50209002

- Representative's name: SCHWABE SANDMAIR MARX PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANW, DE

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-03-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50209002

- Representative's name: SCHWABE SANDMAIR MARX, DE

2011-11-10 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: MANITOWOC CRANE GROUP FRANCE SAS

- Effective date: 20111027

2011-10-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: MANITOWOC CRANE GROUP FRANCE, FR

- Effective date: 20110920

2011-10-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110915 AND 20110921

2007-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070921

2007-06-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2273961 T3

2007-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50209002 P 20070201

2007-01-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061220

2006-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-12-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040322

2004-04-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-04-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY LI

2003-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI